This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 08:38:48 (UTC).

Brown v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Brown filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Grimberg and John K. Larkins, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04996

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

Referral Judge

John K. Larkins, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Michelle Brown

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathleen Marie Flynn

Attorney at Law Offices of Kathleen M. Flynn

Suite 940, 315 West Ponce De Leon Ave.

Decatur, GA 30030

Kenneth R Hiller

Attorney at Law Offices of Kenneth Hiller, PLLC

Suite 1A, 6000 N. Bailey Avenue

Amherst, NY 14226

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER - Plaintiff's #1 IFP application is GRANTED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), as it appears that she is without sufficient funds to pay the fees and costs of this action and still provide for the necessities of life. Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of filing fees, service costs, or any costs of court. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/7/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Application of Kenneth R. Hiller for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/23/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9163038). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Kenneth R Hiller added appearing on behalf of Angela Michelle Brown (pmb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9163038). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Angela Michelle Brown. (Flynn, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Atty, #2 Summons Atty Gen)(tcc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT filed by Angela Michelle Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER - Plaintiff's #1 IFP application is GRANTED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), as it appears that she is without sufficient funds to pay the fees and costs of this action and still provide for the necessities of life. Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of filing fees, service costs, or any costs of court. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/7/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (ah) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Angela Michelle Brown. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons Proposed, #5 Summons Proposed, #6 Summons Proposed, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.