This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2022 at 07:14:24 (UTC).

Brown v. Chicago Title Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/24/2022 Brown filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Chicago Title Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01186

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward Brown

Defendants

Chicago Title Insurance Company

Chicago Title Agency of Nevada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darren T Brenner

Attorney at Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP

7785 W Sahara Ave, Ste 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Lindsay Dragon

Attorney at Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP

7785 W Sahara Ave, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Samuel Sinclair

Attorney at Sinclair Braun LLP

16501 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 400

Encino, CA 91436

Scott E Gizer

Attorney at Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae LLP

8716 Spanish Ridge Avenue, Suite 105

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Sophia Shunwan Lau

Attorney at Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae LLP

8716 Spanish Ridge Avenue, Suite 105

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Gary L. Compton

2950 E. Flamingo Rd., Ste. L

Las Vegas, NV 89121

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Edward Brown. (Dragon, Lindsay) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

12 #3

Exhibit C - Certificate of Compliance issued to Chicago Title of Nevada, Inc. by

12 #2

Exhibit B - Chicago Title of Nevada, Inc.s license

12 #1

Exhibit A - Chicago Title Insurance Companys Insurer license

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. Replies due by 9/13/2022. (Gizer, Scott) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO STAY CASE Pending #8 Motion for Remand by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin) (stay) (dispositive) Modified to link to underlying motion on 8/26/2022 (EDS). (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Edward Brown. Responses due by 9/6/2022. (Dragon, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Brown. Chicago Title Insurance Company served on 8/8/2022. (Dragon, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Brown. Chicago Title Agency of Nevada served on 8/8/2022. (Dragon, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company.. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#4

(#4) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company.. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/25/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/9/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Two

1 #1

Exhibit One

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Edward Brown. (Dragon, Lindsay) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #11 Response by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chicago Title Insurance Companys Insurer license, #2 Exhibit B - Chicago Title of Nevada, Inc.s license, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Compliance issued to Chicago Title of Nevada, Inc. by the Nevada Division of Insurance)(Gizer, Scott) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. Replies due by 9/13/2022. (Gizer, Scott) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO STAY CASE Pending #8 Motion for Remand by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin) (stay) (dispositive) Modified to link to underlying motion on 8/26/2022 (EDS). (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Edward Brown. Responses due by 9/6/2022. (Dragon, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Brown. Chicago Title Insurance Company served on 8/8/2022. (Dragon, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Brown. Chicago Title Agency of Nevada served on 8/8/2022. (Dragon, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company.. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company.. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/25/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/9/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chicago Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC for Chicago Title Insurance Company added. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-855808-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6984169) by Chicago Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 10/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago Title Agency of Nevada is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary L. Compton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E Gizer