This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2021 at 07:07:54 (UTC).

Kimoji Brown v. Cal Closets Retail, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 Kimoji Brown filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cal Closets Retail, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11631

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimoji Brown

Defendants

Cal Closets Retail, Inc.

DOES 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Francis Tibor

Attorney at Tibor Law Firm APC

27200 Agoura Road, Suite 101

Calabasas, CA 91301

Defendant Attorneys

Sara Ashley Zimmerman

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

18565 Jamboree Road Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Jon G Miller

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

18565 Jamboree Road Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/8/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#12

(#12) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 12/24/2020. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc. identifying California Closet Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. Related Case(s): 0 (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc., identifying California Closet Holdings, Inc.; FirstService Brands, Inc.; FirstService Corporation; Chubb Limited. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#5

(#5) DECLARATION of Carol Summersgill re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Andrew Wadhams re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Sara Zimmerman re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

1 #2

Answer

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV45019 Receipt No: ACACDC-29703453 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Answer) (Attorney Sara Ashley Zimmerman added to party Cal Closets Retail, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/8/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/22/2020, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Kimoji Brown in Los Angeles Superior Court on 11/23/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 12/24/2020. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc. identifying California Closet Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. Related Case(s): 0 (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc., identifying California Closet Holdings, Inc.; FirstService Brands, Inc.; FirstService Corporation; Chubb Limited. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Carol Summersgill re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Andrew Wadhams re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Sara Zimmerman re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV45019 Receipt No: ACACDC-29703453 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Cal Closets Retail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Answer) (Attorney Sara Ashley Zimmerman added to party Cal Closets Retail, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zimmerman, Sara) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL CLOSETS RETAIL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon G Miller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara Ashley Zimmerman