This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2022 at 07:34:53 (UTC).

Brown v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Gren Scholer and Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00747

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Karen Gren Scholer

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emmett Brown

Defendants

C R Bard Inc

Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W Hodges

Attorney at Hodges & Foty LLP

4409 Montrose Blvd, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77006

Joshua M Mankoff

Attorney at Lopez McHugh LLP

214 Flynn Ave

Moorestown, NJ 08057

Jerry D Mason

1322 Space Park Drive, Suite A248

Houston, TX 77058

Michael I Katz

18101 Von Karman Ave, Suite 230

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B North, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Melissa Dorman Matthews

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC

500 North Akard Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201

Brandee J Kowalzyk

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Craig W Phillips

Attorney at Skelly Oberling & Phillips LLC

1313 East Osborn Road, Suite 120

Phoenix, AZ 85014

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12773199) filed by Emmett Brown Attorney Joshua M Mankoff added to party Emmett Brown(pty:pla) (Mankoff, Joshua) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Richard B. North, Jr. on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 04/24/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court VACATES the previous scheduling order [ECF No. #7 ]. Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 1/23/2023 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 6/6/2022. Motions due by 9/19/2022. Discovery due by 9/5/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/20/2022) (mjr) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#9

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Craig W Phillips as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation within 90 days before trial. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/20/2022) (ygl) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Sam R Cummings no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/19/2022) (ndt) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2022. Motions due by 4/17/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/17/2023. Discovery due by 6/12/2023. Trial set for 7/5/2023 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/11/2022) (mjr) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Brandee J. Kowalzyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 4 replaced/flattened PDF on 4/5/2022) (ygl). (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 3 replaced/flattened PDF on 4/5/2022) (ygl). (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

1 #9

Exhibit(s) F - Issued Citation to BPV

1 #7

Exhibit(s) D - Request for Issuance of Citations

1 #6

Exhibit(s) C - Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s) A - Dallas County Court Docket

1 #3

Index of State Court Documents

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua M Mankoff. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/2/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12773199) filed by Emmett Brown Attorney Joshua M Mankoff added to party Emmett Brown(pty:pla) (Mankoff, Joshua) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Richard B. North, Jr. on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 04/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court VACATES the previous scheduling order [ECF No. #7 ]. Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 1/23/2023 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 6/6/2022. Motions due by 9/19/2022. Discovery due by 9/5/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/20/2022) (mjr) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Craig W Phillips as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation within 90 days before trial. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/20/2022) (ygl) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Sam R Cummings no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/19/2022) (ndt) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2022. Motions due by 4/17/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/17/2023. Discovery due by 6/12/2023. Trial set for 7/5/2023 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/11/2022) (mjr) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Brandee J. Kowalzyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 4 replaced/flattened PDF on 4/5/2022) (ygl). (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 3 replaced/flattened PDF on 4/5/2022) (ygl). (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12716753) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Index of State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit(s) A - Dallas County Court Docket, #5 Exhibit(s) B - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit(s) C - Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit(s) D - Request for Issuance of Citations, #8 Exhibit(s) E - Issued Citation to C. R. Bard, Inc., #9 Exhibit(s) F - Issued Citation to BPV, #10 Exhibit(s) G - Officer's Return - C. R. Bard, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig W Phillips