This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 13:04:09 (UTC).

Brown v. Akron Pharmaceuticals et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Akron Pharmaceuticals. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00814

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lottoria Brown

Wilmington, DE 19805

Defendants

Akron Pharmaceuticals

Fresenius Kabi USA LLC

Haldol Injection Manufacturer

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/9/2019. (ceg) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Lottoria Brown. (ceg) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Akron Pharmaceuticals, Fresenius Kabi USA LLC, and Haldol Injection Manufacturer - filed by Lottoria Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) ORDER, plaintiff shall return to Clerk original USM 285 form(s) for each Defendant. Upon receipt, the U.S. Marshal shall serve process as directed by plaintiff. (Copy to pltf. with 285 forms). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/27/2019. (nmg) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER, plaintiff shall return to Clerk original USM 285 form(s) for each Defendant. Upon receipt, the U.S. Marshal shall serve process as directed by plaintiff. (Copy to pltf. with 285 forms). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/27/2019. (nmg) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/9/2019. (ceg) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Akron Pharmaceuticals, Fresenius Kabi USA LLC, and Haldol Injection Manufacturer - filed by Lottoria Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Lottoria Brown. (ceg) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.