This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:37:49 (UTC).

BROWN v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by BROWN against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-17167

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Karen M. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEAN BROWN

Defendant

ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916666) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SEAN BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, PETER) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by GIANNA ELISSA CRICCO-LIZZA on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

4 #1

Brief

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#4

Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. identifying Abbott Laboratories as Corporate Parent.. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC..(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

16 #5

Text of Proposed Order

16 #3

Exhibit B - Declaration of W. Dowd

16 #4

Exhibit C - Declaration of L. Lumaghi

16 #1

Declaration Peter W. Smith

16 #2

Exhibit A - Declaration of D. Dowd

#16

(#16) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Douglas P. Dowd, William T. Dowd, and Laura G. Lumaghi by SEAN BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Peter W. Smith, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of D. Dowd, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of W. Dowd, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of L. Lumaghi, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(SMITH, PETER) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gianna E. Cricco-Lizza in Support, #2 Certification of Stephen E. Marshall in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

15 #3

Text of Proposed Order

15 #2

Certification of Stephen E. Marshall in Support

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Douglas P. Dowd, William T. Dowd, and Laura G. Lumaghi by SEAN BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Peter W. Smith, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of D. Dowd, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of W. Dowd, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of L. Lumaghi, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(SMITH, PETER) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gianna E. Cricco-Lizza in Support, #2 Certification of Stephen E. Marshall in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gianna Cricco-Lizza in Support, #2 Certification of Christopher La Testa in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#13) TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated September 30, 2019 from Gianna E. Cricco-Lizza, Esquire, counsel for defendant, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the in-person Initial Conference previously set for October 24, 2019, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is November 25, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Room 2040- Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/1/19. (nar) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Letter from Gianna E. Cricco-Lizza, Esq.. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • (#11) TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon pre-motion letters, filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc. [Dkt. No. 9] and Plaintiff Sean Brown [Dkt. No. 10], regarding Defendants proposed motion to dismiss Counts III, IV, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX, and X from Plaintiffs Complaint. In response to Defendants proposed motion, Plaintiff has requested permission to file an amended complaint. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be permitted thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint. If, after the amended complaint is filed, Defendant still wishes to file a motion to dismiss, it should once again follow the procedures set forth in this Courts Individual Rules and Procedures. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 09/26/2019. (Costigan, Roberta) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Andrew D'Arcy re #9 Letter. (SMITH, PETER) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC..(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. identifying Abbott Laboratories as Corporate Parent.. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by GIANNA ELISSA CRICCO-LIZZA on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by Peter W. Smith on 8/23/2019 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account (under the "Utilities" tab in CM/ECF). (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916666) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SEAN BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, PETER) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.