This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/22/2019 at 07:51:18 (UTC).

Brown-Freddie v. The Workforce Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 Brown-Freddie filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against The Workforce Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04154

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loretta S Brown-Freddie

Defendant

The Workforce Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyla Gail Cole

Attorney at Neill Legler Cole

3141 Hood St, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Having been advised Brown-Freddie wants to dismiss this case, it is dismissed without prejudice #3 . Case terminated on 10/29/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Parties by Loretta S Brown-Freddie, filed. (Cole, Kyla) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Workforce Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23423721) filed by Loretta S Brown-Freddie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cole, Kyla) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Having been advised Brown-Freddie wants to dismiss this case, it is dismissed without prejudice #3 . Case terminated on 10/29/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Parties by Loretta S Brown-Freddie, filed. (Cole, Kyla) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The Workforce Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23423721) filed by Loretta S Brown-Freddie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cole, Kyla) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORKHORSE GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyla Cole