This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:46:31 (UTC).

Brown et al v. Wolf et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Brown filed an Other lawsuit against Wolf. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Embry J. Kidd and Gregory A. Presnell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02303

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alicia Brown

Maged Kadoura

Defendants

Acting Secretary Chad Wolf

Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli

Kenneth T. Cuccinelli

Chad Wolf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Stoller

Attorney at Law Offices of David Stoller, PA

4445 S Conway Rd

Orlando, FL 32812-0073

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit Filing Receipt, I-130

1 #6

Exhibit Marriage Cert., Kadoura to Underhill

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Chad Wolf. (MEJ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #9

Exhibit Marriage Cert., Kadoura and Brown

1 #10

Exhibit USCIS Processing Report Explanation

1 #8

Exhibit Divorce, Kadoura and Underhill

1 #3

Exhibit Marriage Cert., Kadoura to Lochner

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli. (MEJ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit DR Divorce

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16224816) filed by Alicia Brown, Maged Kadoura. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filing Receipt, I-130, #2 Exhibit Denial Letter, Form I-485, #3 Exhibit Marriage Cert., Kadoura to Lochner, #4 Exhibit Form I-130 filed by Lochner, #5 Exhibit DR Divorce, #6 Exhibit Marriage Cert., Kadoura to Underhill, #7 Exhibit Divorce, Kadoura and Lochner, #8 Exhibit Divorce, Kadoura and Underhill, #9 Exhibit Marriage Cert., Kadoura and Brown, #10 Exhibit USCIS Processing Report Explanation, #11 Exhibit Current Orlando Processing Report, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons Summons.Wolf, #14 Proposed Summons Summons.Cuccinelli)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit Divorce, Kadoura and Lochner

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alicia Brown, Maged Kadoura. Related case(s): yes (Stoller, David) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #7 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/22/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Form I-130 filed by Lochner

#5

(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/11/2019. (LAM) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Denial Letter, Form I-485

#7

(#7) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Alicia Brown, Maged Kadoura (Stoller, David) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #7 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/22/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Alicia Brown, Maged Kadoura (Stoller, David) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alicia Brown, Maged Kadoura. Related case(s): yes (Stoller, David) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/11/2019. (LAM) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli. (MEJ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Chad Wolf. (MEJ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-2303-Orl-31EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16224816) filed by Alicia Brown, Maged Kadoura. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filing Receipt, I-130, #2 Exhibit Denial Letter, Form I-485, #3 Exhibit Marriage Cert., Kadoura to Lochner, #4 Exhibit Form I-130 filed by Lochner, #5 Exhibit DR Divorce, #6 Exhibit Marriage Cert., Kadoura to Underhill, #7 Exhibit Divorce, Kadoura and Lochner, #8 Exhibit Divorce, Kadoura and Underhill, #9 Exhibit Marriage Cert., Kadoura and Brown, #10 Exhibit USCIS Processing Report Explanation, #11 Exhibit Current Orlando Processing Report, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons Summons.Wolf, #14 Proposed Summons Summons.Cuccinelli)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less