This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2022 at 07:03:21 (UTC).

Brown et al v. United Parcel Service of America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 Brown filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Parcel Service of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01672

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Timothy Brown

Ronnie Suveg

Joseph Bobertz

Clifford Potters

Stacey Richards

Warren Washburn

Nancy Youngermann

John Braxton

Defendants

United Parcel Service of America, Inc.

the Administrative Committee of the UPS Retirement Plan

the Board of Trustees of the UPS Pension Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David James Worley

Attorney at Evangelista Worley, LLC

500 Sugar Mill Road, Suite 245A

Atlanta, GA 30350

Douglas P. Needham

Attorney at Izard, Kindall & Raabe, LLP

29 South Main Street, Suite 305

West Hartford, CT 06107

Erin M. Riley

Attorney at Keller Rohrback

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Gregory Y. Porter

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP-DC

Suite 540, 1055 Thomas Jefferson St., Nw

Washington, DC 20007

James M. Evangelista

Attorney at Evangelista Worley LLC

500 Sugar Mill Road, Suite 245A

Atlanta, GA 30350

Jeffrey G. Lewis

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

180 Grand Avenue, Suite 1380

Oakland, CA 94612

Kristi Stahnke McGregor

Attorney at Evangelista Worley LLC

500 Sugar Mill Road, Suite 245A

Atlanta, GA 30350

Mark George Boyko

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser

34 N. Gore Avenue, Suite 102

Webster Groves, MO 63119

Oren Faircloth

Attorney at Izard Kindall & Raabe, LLP

29 South Main St.

West Hartford, CT 06107

Robert A. Izard, Jr

Attorney at Izard Kindall & Raabe, LLP

29 South Main St.

West Hartford, CT 06107

Defendant Attorneys

David R. Godofsky

Attorney at Alston & Bird

950 F Street

Washington, DC 20004

Emily Seymour Costin

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP - DC

The Atlantic Building, 950 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1404

Richard Blakeman Crohan

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 W. Peachtree Street St. Ne, Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by United Parcel Service of America, Inc., the Administrative Committee of the UPS Retirement Plan, the Board of Trustees of the UPS Pension Plan. Discovery ends on 11/21/2022.(Crohan, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#22

(#22) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service of America, Inc., the Administrative Committee of the UPS Retirement Plan, the Board of Trustees of the UPS Pension Plan identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for United Parcel Service of America, Inc.. (Crohan, Richard) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Bobertz, Nancy Youngermann, Ronnie Suveg, Timothy Brown, Clifford Potters, John Braxton, Warren Washburn, Stacey Richards. the Administrative Committee of the UPS Retirement Plan waiver mailed on 4/29/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Worley, David) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Bobertz, Nancy Youngermann, Ronnie Suveg, Timothy Brown, Clifford Potters, John Braxton, Warren Washburn, Stacey Richards. the Board of Trustees of the UPS Pension Plan waiver mailed on 4/29/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Worley, David) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Bobertz, Nancy Youngermann, Ronnie Suveg, Timothy Brown, Clifford Potters, John Braxton, Warren Washburn, Stacey Richards. United Parcel Service of America, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/29/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Worley, David) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to the Board of Trustees of the UPS Pension Plan. (eop) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to the Administrative Committee of the UPS Retirement Plan. (eop) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to United Parcel Service of America, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by United Parcel Service of America, Inc., the Administrative Committee of the UPS Retirement Plan, the Board of Trustees of the UPS Pension Plan. Discovery ends on 11/21/2022.(Crohan, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service of America, Inc., the Administrative Committee of the UPS Retirement Plan, the Board of Trustees of the UPS Pension Plan identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for United Parcel Service of America, Inc.. (Crohan, Richard) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Erin M. Riley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11861031). to attorney for correction re: Updated form and party being represented. (cdg) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Lewis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11860969). to attorney for correction re: Updated Form and party being represented. (cdg) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPLICATION for Admission of Erin M. Riley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11861031).by Timothy Brown. (Worley, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Lewis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11860969).by Timothy Brown. (Worley, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #18 and #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory Y. Porter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11801817). Attorney Gregory Y. Porter added appearing on behalf of Joseph Bobertz, John Braxton, Timothy Brown, Clifford Potters, Stacey Richards, Ronnie Suveg, Warren Washburn, Nancy Youngermann (cdg) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark G. Boyko Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11801811). Attorney Mark George Boyko added appearing on behalf of Joseph Bobertz, John Braxton, Timothy Brown, Clifford Potters, Stacey Richards, Ronnie Suveg, Warren Washburn, Nancy Youngermann (cdg) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #8 , #9 , and #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION for Admission of Robert A. Izard Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11789482).by Timothy Brown. (Worley, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Oren Faircloth Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11789469).by Timothy Brown. (Worley, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas P. Needham Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11789377).by Timothy Brown. (Worley, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Bobertz, Nancy Youngermann, Ronnie Suveg, Timothy Brown, Clifford Potters, John Braxton, Warren Washburn, Stacey Richards. the Administrative Committee of the UPS Retirement Plan waiver mailed on 4/29/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Worley, David) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Bobertz, Nancy Youngermann, Ronnie Suveg, Timothy Brown, Clifford Potters, John Braxton, Warren Washburn, Stacey Richards. the Board of Trustees of the UPS Pension Plan waiver mailed on 4/29/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Worley, David) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Bobertz, Nancy Youngermann, Ronnie Suveg, Timothy Brown, Clifford Potters, John Braxton, Warren Washburn, Stacey Richards. United Parcel Service of America, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/29/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Worley, David) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to the Board of Trustees of the UPS Pension Plan. (eop) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to the Administrative Committee of the UPS Retirement Plan. (eop) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to United Parcel Service of America, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Bobertz, Nancy Youngermann, Ronnie Suveg, Timothy Brown, Clifford Potters, John Braxton, Warren Washburn and Stacey Richards. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11763479) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard B Crohan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Godofsky