This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:40:46 (UTC).

Brown et al v. State Farm Lloyds

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Brown filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Lloyds. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jane J. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00790

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane J. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cherry Brown

Charles Brown

Defendant

State Farm Lloyds

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek L. Fadner

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Associates PLLC

411 N Sam Houston Pkwy East, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77060

Derek L Fadner

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Associates PLLC

516 Heights Blvd

Houston, TX 77007

Jacob Lawrence von Plonski

Attorney at Clark & McCrea

3500 Maple Avenue, Suite 1250

Dallas, TX 75219

John Zachary Moseley

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Associates PLLC

516 Heights Blvd.

Houston, TX 77007

James M McClenny

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Associates PLLC

516 Heights Blvd.

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Armando De Diego

Attorney at The Law Office of Armando De Diego PC

1201 Griffin St W

Dallas, TX 75215-1030

Harvey G Joseph

Attorney at The Law Office of Armando De Diego PC

1201 West Griffin Street

Dallas, TX 75215-1030

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Courtenay L Bass

Attorney at Gilbert Mediation Group

12001 N Central Expressway, Ste 650

Dallas, TX 75243

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Courtenay L Bass as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/21/2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/9/2019) (rekc) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by State Farm Lloyds (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant filed by Charles Brown, Cherry Brown. (Fadner, Derek) Modified to add filer on 5/8/2019 (zkc). (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Derek L. Fadner on behalf of Charles Brown. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Fadner, Derek) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#13

(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Mediator filed by State Farm Lloyds. (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#12

(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Mediator filed by State Farm Lloyds. (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 7/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2019. Motions due by 4/15/2020. Discovery due by 3/23/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/21/2020. Pretrial Order due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/26/2019) (svc) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING DISCOVERY & SCHEDULING filed by State Farm Lloyds. (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Offer of Judgment of Defendant filed by State Farm Lloyds (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Lawrence von Plonski on behalf of Charles Brown, Cherry Brown. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (von Plonski, Jacob) Modified to add filer on 4/9/2019 (zkc). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#7

(#7) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/8/2019) (svc) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION To Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by Charles Brown (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fadner, Derek) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charles Brown. (Fadner, Derek) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Lloyds. (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 354th District Court, Hunt County, TX, case number 87128 filed by State Farm Lloyds. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9886834) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s) State Court Pleadings) (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Courtenay L Bass as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/21/2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/9/2019) (rekc) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by State Farm Lloyds (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant filed by Charles Brown, Cherry Brown. (Fadner, Derek) Modified to add filer on 5/8/2019 (zkc). (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Derek L. Fadner on behalf of Charles Brown. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Fadner, Derek) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Mediator filed by State Farm Lloyds. (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Mediator filed by State Farm Lloyds. (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 7/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2019. Motions due by 4/15/2020. Discovery due by 3/23/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/21/2020. Pretrial Order due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/26/2019) (svc) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING DISCOVERY & SCHEDULING filed by State Farm Lloyds. (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Offer of Judgment of Defendant filed by State Farm Lloyds (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Lawrence von Plonski on behalf of Charles Brown, Cherry Brown. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (von Plonski, Jacob) Modified to add filer on 4/9/2019 (zkc). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/8/2019) (svc) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Local counsel for Plaintiff must appear by 5/6/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/4/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION To Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by Charles Brown (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fadner, Derek) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charles Brown. (Fadner, Derek) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Lloyds. (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 354th District Court, Hunt County, TX, case number 87128 filed by State Farm Lloyds. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9886834) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s) State Court Pleadings) (De Diego, Armando) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Lloyds as Subrogee of Bryan Dietzel is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtenay L Bass