This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2021 at 07:03:46 (UTC).

Brown County Publishing Company, Inc. et al v. Google LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Brown County Publishing Company, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah Netburn and P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06915

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sarah Netburn

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brown County Publishing Company Inc

Multi Media Channels LLC

Defendants

Google LLC

Facebook Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W. Mitchell

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP (SANDIEGO)

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Erin K Dickinson

Attorney at Crueger Dickinson LLC

4532 N Oakland Ave

Whitefish Bay, WI 53211

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Orsini

Attorney at Cravath Swaine & Moore LLP

825 8Th Ave

New York, NY 10019-7475

Kevin J. Orsini

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#39

(#13) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/24/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

10 #1

*Restricted*

10 #10

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) ORDER re #7 Stipulation filed by Facebook Inc signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/23/21. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the operative Complaint 21 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves Googles April 30, 2021 Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California, or if the Transfer Motion is granted, until the date by which the transferee judge orders Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the operative Complaint, whichever is later. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 06/23/2021)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Exhibit A - Google Defendants' Motion for Transfer of Actions

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE Statement by Facebook Inc. (Orsini, Kevin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Facebook Inc - Waiver sent on 4/29/2021. (Mitchell, David) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Google LLC - Waiver sent on 4/29/2021. (Mitchell, David) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#2

(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Brown County Publishing Company, Inc., Multi Media Channels, LLC.(Dickinson, Erin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/20/2021)

1 #3

Summons Google LLC

1 #2

Summons Facebook Inc

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/24/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2021 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: The conference scheduled for Friday, September 24, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 11D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Ceremonial Courtroom 9C is set as an overflow courtroom. Remote telephone information is provided below: Dial in: 1 888-363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/20/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(laq) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (laq) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (laq) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number: 1:21-cv-00498. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re #7 Stipulation filed by Facebook Inc signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/23/21. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the operative Complaint 21 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves Googles April 30, 2021 Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California, or if the Transfer Motion is granted, until the date by which the transferee judge orders Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the operative Complaint, whichever is later. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Facebook Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Google Defendants' Motion for Transfer of Actions, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Orsini, Kevin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE Statement by Facebook Inc. (Orsini, Kevin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Facebook Inc - Waiver sent on 4/29/2021. (Mitchell, David) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Google LLC - Waiver sent on 4/29/2021. (Mitchell, David) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David W Mitchell on behalf of Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Multi Media Channels LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: David W. Mitchell (Mitchell, David) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Facebook Inc, Google LLC. (tlf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Brown County Publishing Company, Inc., Multi Media Channels, LLC.(Dickinson, Erin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Brown County Publishing Company, Inc., Multi Media Channels, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3796080) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Facebook Inc, #3 Summons Google LLC)(Dickinson, Erin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Orsini