This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 07:58:04 (UTC).

Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen v. Union Pacific Railway Company

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Union Pacific Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Carla Baldwin and Larry R. Hicks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00014

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carla Baldwin

Presiding Judge

Larry R. Hicks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen

Defendant

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael E. Langton

Attorney at Law Office of Michael E. Langton

801 Riverside Dr

Reno, NV 89503

Richard S Edelman

Attorney at Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy and Welch, PC

1920 L Street Nw, Suite 400, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorney

Karl Orell Riley

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

3753 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than Tuesday, May 9, 2023 (5/9/2023). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#16

(#16) STANDING ORDER for the Honorable Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CLB) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

15 #1

Certificate of Service

15 #15

Main Document

14 #1

Certificate of Service

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) ORDER granting ECF No. #12 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. #8 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/31/2023. Reply due by 4/28/2023. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

8 #8

Declaration

8 #7

Declaration

8 #6

Declaration

8 #5

Declaration

8 #4

Exhibit

8 #3

Exhibit

8 #1

Declaration

8 #8

Main Document

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than Tuesday, May 9, 2023 (5/9/2023). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STANDING ORDER for the Honorable Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CLB) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Union Pacific Railroad Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Riley, Karl) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/20/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Riley, Karl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting ECF No. #12 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. #8 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/31/2023. Reply due by 4/28/2023. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order re #8 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Riley, Karl) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TIME TO ANSWER (First Request) granting ECF No. #10 Stipulation. Union Pacific Railroad Company answer due 3/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Riley, Karl) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:23-cv-00014-LRH-CLB. (no image attached) (DRS) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. Responses due by 2/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration)(Langton, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen served on 1/18/2023. (Langton, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER approving ECF No. #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard S Edelman for Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael E. Langton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/18/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard S. Edelman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Langton (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7174305) by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Langton, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Richard D. Edelman to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/25/2023. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Union Pacific Railroad Company. (DRM) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 2/1/2023. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (DRM) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DRM) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT by BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN against Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7168495) by BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN. Proof of service due by 4/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Langton, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 1/10/2023 to correct case opening docket text (added defendant's name) (DRM). (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less