This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2020 at 08:36:52 (UTC).

Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen v. BNSF Railway

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against BNSF Railway. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01209

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen

Defendant

BNSF Railway

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James I. Singer

Attorney at SCHUCHAT COOK

555 Washington Avenue, Suite 520

St. Louis, MO 63101

Richard S. Edelman

Attorney at MOONEY GREEN SAINDON

1920 L Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Aaron S. Edelman

Attorney at MOONEY GREEN SAINDON

1920 L Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorney

Allison Elizabeth Lee

Attorney at BOYLE BRASHER LLC - St Louis

1010 Market St., Suite 950

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Stay Proceedings on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Singer, James) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Stay re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Singer, James) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Stay re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant BNSF Railway. (Lee, Allison) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

15 #15

Exhibit 14

15 #11

Exhibit 10

15 #1

Affidavit Declaration of J. Rhodes

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant BNSF Railway. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Rhodes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Lee, Allison) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant BNSF Railway. (Lee, Allison) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#10

(#16) MOTION to Stay re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant BNSF Railway. (Lee, Allison) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#8

(#9) Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 10/19/20. (MCC) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

6 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#7) Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 10/14/20. (MCC) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen.. (Singer, James) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen BNSF Railway waiver signed on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Singer, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

1 #3

Summons Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Attachment Award for D Drum

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant BNSF Railway with receipt number AMOEDC-8129001, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Award for D Drum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Waiver of Service form )(Singer, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2020: #4 Original Filing Form) (BAK). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Stay Proceedings on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Singer, James) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Stay re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Singer, James) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Singer, James) filed by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/30/2020. (KEK) Modified on 10/30/2020 (KEK). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings (AFC) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Singer, James) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Text ORDER: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #10 is stayed pending resolution of Defendant's Motion to Stay #16 . So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 10/28/20. (MCC) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant BNSF Railway. Parent companies: Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Berkshire Hathaway Inc.,. (Lee, Allison) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Stay re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant BNSF Railway. (Lee, Allison) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant BNSF Railway. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Rhodes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Lee, Allison) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant BNSF Railway. (Lee, Allison) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 10/19/20. (MCC) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Aaron S. Edelman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8220047) by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Edelman, Aaron) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 10/14/20. (MCC) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard E. Edelman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8209362) by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Edelman, Richard) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen.. (Singer, James) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 10/15/2020. (KJS) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen BNSF Railway waiver signed on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Singer, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby. (BAK) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant BNSF Railway with receipt number AMOEDC-8129001, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Award for D Drum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Waiver of Service form )(Singer, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2020: #4 Original Filing Form) (BAK). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less