This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 08:51:32 (UTC).

BROOKSIDE BANQUETS, LLC et al v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 BROOKSIDE BANQUETS, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08832

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE GYM LAKEWOOD, INC.

HOSPITALITY INNOVATIONS T/A REDDS BIERGARTEN

DIMITRIOS T. PERIDES & THEODOROS P. PERIDES D/B/A PEROS INC. T/A BIAGIOS RESTAURANT

PALSI CORP. T/A REDDS RESTAURANT & BAR

LAND NEIL, INC., D/B/A FIESTA BANQUETS & DELDOR REALTY

BROOKSIDE BANQUETS, LLC

PREMIUM FOOD & BEVERAGE LLC T/A REDDS BIERGARTEN

Defendants

AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE GROUP

AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP

SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANCIS PATRICK CROTTY

Attorney at SMITH, CROTTY, MEYER & BRUINS

851 Franklin Lake Road, Suite 101

Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL D. HYNES

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

RACHEL R. HAGER

Attorney at FINAZZO COSSOLINI O'LEARY MEOLA & HAGER, L.L.C.

67 East Park Place, Suite 901

Morristown, NJ 07960

ELIZABETH J. SHER

Attorney at DAY PITNEY LLP

One Jefferson Road

Parsippany, NJ 07054-2891

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION & Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PICKETT, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Update - The document #3 submitted by AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/18/2021. (sm) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER that American Automobiles time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from April 30, 2021 to June 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/17/2021. (sm) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER: Per counsel's request, and with consent, (ECF No. 5), the deadline for Defendant Ohio Security Insurance Company (pled as Liberty Mutual Insurance Company) to respond to the Complaint is extended through and including 6/18/21. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/12/2021. (tjd) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Update - The document #7 submitted by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/18/2021. (sm) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendant Selective Insurance Company's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint if extended from 5/7/2021 to 6/18/2021. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/7/2021. (sm) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (SHER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH J. SHER on behalf of SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY (SHER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney RACHEL R. HAGER for LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP added. (HAGER, RACHEL) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER: Per the parties' stipulation, (ECF No. 3), the deadline for Defendant American Automobile Insurance Company to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including 6/18/21. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor 4/29/2021. (tjd) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (HYNES, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (HYNES, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (with Exhibit) from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER-L-001757-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12356875), filed by AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HYNES, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where American Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant