This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2020 at 08:44:43 (UTC).

Brooks v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (PLR3)

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Brooks filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Wakefield Associates, Inc PLR3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cynthia R Wyrick and Pamela L Reeves. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cynthia R Wyrick

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kasey L. Brooks

Defendant

Wakefield & Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan C Lee

Attorney at Alan C. Lee, Attorney

Post Office Box 1357

Talbott, TN 37877-1357

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with prejudice as to all remaining Defendants by Kasey L. Brooks (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Kasey L. Brooks Trial Date: N/A; Case Reported Settled By Alan C. Lee, Attorney for Plaintiff; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kasey L. Brooks. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 4/13/2020. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

1 #2

Summons - Wakefield

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4285828.), filed by Kasey L Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with prejudice as to all remaining Defendants by Kasey L. Brooks (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Kasey L. Brooks Trial Date: N/A; Case Reported Settled By Alan C. Lee, Attorney for Plaintiff; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kasey L. Brooks. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 4/13/2020. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4285828.), filed by Kasey L Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less