This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 07:18:29

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Brooks against True in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-CV-00789
  • Filing Date 07/22/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Other Prisoner
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Staci M. Yandle
  • Courthouse Illinois Southern District

Party Details

  • Petitioner Lorenzo A. Brooks
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant B. True
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

4 #1

Consent to Magistrate Judge

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Petition ...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Letter from Petitioner regarding filing fee. (jaj) (Ent...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) MOTION for Relief by Lorenzo A. Brooks. (jaj) (Entered:...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lorenzo A. ...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • (#5) ORDER: The Court has received your payment of the filing fee. Now the Court will review your petition to determine whether it survives preliminary review under Rule 4 and Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in United States District Courts. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in an Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you do not receive a preliminary review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel, it will not be considered until the Court has completed the preliminary review of your petition. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). In the event your petition survives the preliminary review, the Court will instruct the respondent to file a response to the petition and you will be notified of your deadline to file a reply. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/15/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/15/2019)
  • 08/14/2019
  • Habeas Corpus Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 34625095145 (cjo) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Your case number is 19-789-SMY. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $5.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(jaj) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) Letter from Petitioner regarding filing fee. (jaj) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#2) MOTION for Relief by Lorenzo A. Brooks. (jaj) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lorenzo A. Brooks.(jaj) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.