This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2020 at 06:08:48 (UTC).

Brooks v. Toro Company, The

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 Brooks filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Toro Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Cowan Wright, Nancy E. Brasel, Becky R. Thorson and Paul A. Magnuson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02345

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Becky R. Thorson

Presiding Judges

Nancy E. Brasel

Paul A. Magnuson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Brooks

Defendants

Toro Company, The

Toro International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karla M Gluek

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South 6Th Street, Suite 2600

Mpls, MN 55402

Daniel E Gustafson

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South 6Th Street, Suite 2600

Mpls, MN 55402

Amanda M Williams

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South 6Th Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Richard M Paul, III

Attorney at Paul LLP

601 Walnut Street, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64106

Ashlea Schwarz

Attorney at Paul LLP

601 Walnut Street, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64106

Sean R Cooper

Attorney at Paul LLP

601 Walnut Street, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64106

Defendant Attorneys

Heidi A O Fisher

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

Campbell Mithun Tower - Suite 2000, 222 South Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 554023338

Andrew S Hansen

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

222 South Ninth Street, Campbell Mithun Tower, Ste 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Randall J Pattee

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

222 South Ninth Street, Suite 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Ellie J Barragry

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

222 South Ninth Street, Suite 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark J. Tamblyn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7449377 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#41

(#41) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7449368 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#40

(#40) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Fisher, Heidi) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#33

No Description Available

31 #1

Exhibit(s) A-D

#27

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

17 #2

Exhibit(s) B

17 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#16

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#6

(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard M Paul, III for William Brooks; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ashlea Schwarz for William Brooks; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean R Cooper for William Brooks. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/28/2019. (NAH) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kenneth A Wexler for William Brooks; granting #42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark Tamblyn for William Brooks. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/4/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark J. Tamblyn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7449377 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7449368 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Fisher, Heidi) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Joseph Pepper for William Brooks. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/29/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James J. Pepper. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7434904 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#37) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kenneth A. Wexler, Mark J. Tamblyn, James Pepper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Toro Company, The. filed by William Brooks. No summons requested. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Plan and Non-Dispositive Motions are split into Phase One and Phase Two as follows: Discovery Cut-Off Phase One: August 1, 2020 Fact; September 1, 2020 Expert; Discovery Cut-Off Phase Two:February 1, 2021 Fact; April 1, 2021 - Expert. Non-Dispositive Motions Phase One: September 1, 2020; Non-Dispositive Motions Phase Two: April 1, 2021. Dispositive Motions Phase One: November 1, 2020; Dispositive Motions Phase Two: May 1, 2021. Ready for Jury Trial by July 1, 2021. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 1/16/2020. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-02294-PAM-BRT, 0:19-cv-02345-PAM-BRT(LLM) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(#34) TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting (30) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:19-cv-02294-PAM-BRT; granting (28) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:19-cv-02345-PAM-BRT. The Court orally granted these motions at the Rule 16 scheduling conference. Plaintiffs are to file their amended pleadings as a new filing. Entered by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 1/16/2020. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-02294-PAM-BRT, 0:19-cv-02345-PAM-BRT(ALT) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2345 PAM/BRT. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 8/27/2019 and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 8/28/19. (CLK) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Brooks. Toro Company, The served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019; Toro International, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard M Paul, III for William Brooks; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ashlea Schwarz for William Brooks; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean R Cooper for William Brooks. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/28/2019. (NAH) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean R. Cooper. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7110203 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ashlea G. Schwarz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7108869 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard M. Paul III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7108854 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, Sean R. Cooper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2345 NEB/ECW. (CLK) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The Toro Company, Toro International, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7104437) filed by William Brooks. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.