This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2020 at 08:56:56 (UTC).

Brooks v. Sanofi S.A. et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 Brooks filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-80895

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Brooks

Defendants

Chattem Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Sanofi S.A.

Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.

SANOFI AVENTIS U.S. LLC

Glaxosmithkline LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter C. Wetherall

Attorney at Wetherall Group, Ltd.

9345 W. Sunset Road Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Peter S. Christiansen

Attorney at Christiansen Law Offices

810 S. Casino Center Boulevard Suite 104

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Keely A. Perdue

Attorney at Christiansen Law Offices

810 S. Casino Center Blvd, Suite 104

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Mark S. Cheffo

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Chad R. Fears

Attorney at Evans Fears & Schuttert LLP

2300 W. Sahara Avenue Suite 950

Las Evans, NV 89102

Will W. Sachse

Attorney at Dechert LLP

2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104

 

Court Documents

#22

19 #1

*Restricted*

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Text only Minute order from MDL panel

#16

#15

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Copy of all process, pleadings and orders served on defendants

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docket(#21) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Nevada. Case Number 2:20-cv-00565 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80895-RLR on 6/4/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docket(#20) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Case transferred in from Nevada; Case Number 2:20-cv-00565. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #17 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Serve Complaint re #15 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Thomas Brooks. (Christiansen, Peter) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Copy of ORDER Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order dated 4/16/2020 from MDL No. 2924. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 4/16/2020 (MMM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2020: #1 Text only Minute order from MDL panel) (DRS). (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Summons Issued as to Sanofi S.A. re Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal. (MR) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Thomas Brooks. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #6 plaintiff's motion to remand be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #11 defendant's motion to stay be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action be, and the same hereby is, STAYED pending transfer to the Zantac MDL. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Fears, Chad) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Expedite. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall file its response to #6 plaintiff's motion to remand on or before Wednesday, 4/8/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file its reply, if any, to defendant's response on or before Friday, 4/10/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Expedite re #6 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Thomas Brooks. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Thomas Brooks. Responses due by 4/15/2020. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Thomas Brooks. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GlaxoSmithKline LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate GlaxoSmithKline PLC, Other Affiliate GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., Other Affiliate GlaxoSmithKline Finance plc, Other Affiliate GSK Finance (No 2) Limited, Other Affiliate GlaxoSmithKline Holdings Limited for GlaxoSmithKline LLC added. (Fears, Chad) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/23/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/7/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Mark S. Cheffo and Will W. Sachse to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/7/2020. (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, State of Nevada, Case Number A-20-810518-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5936873) by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of all process, pleadings and orders served on defendants, #2 Exhibit 2 - Copy of the state court docket as well as all papers filed in the state court action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fears, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chattem Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GlaxoSmithKline LLC is a litigant