This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2020 at 10:50:32 (UTC).

Brooks v. Prada USA Corp.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Brooks filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Prada USA Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01640

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valerie Brooks

Defendant

Prada USA Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Prada USA Corp. on 8/17/2020, Answer due 10/16/2020 (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Prada USA Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago Merlini Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Prada USA Corp. by Valerie Brooks. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9056251) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Prada USA Corp. on 8/17/2020, Answer due 10/16/2020 (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Prada USA Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago Merlini Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Prada USA Corp. by Valerie Brooks. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9056251) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRADA USA INC. DBA MIU MIU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thiago M. Coelho