This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2020 at 10:02:23 (UTC).

Brooks v. Loro Piana & C., Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Brooks filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Loro Piana C , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01759

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valerie Brooks

Defendant

Loro Piana & C., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Valerie Brooks. (Coelho, Thiago) Modified on 10/14/2020 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Loro Piana & C., Inc. on 9/4/2020, Answer due 11/3/2020 (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

3 #3

VDRP

3 #2

Consent Form

3 #1

KJM Standing Order

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 KJM Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Becknal, R). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Loro Piana & C., Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Loro Piana & C., Inc. by Valerie Brooks. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9087165) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Pursuant to the representations of Plaintiff, the court has determined this case has settled. (See ECF No. #5 ) Dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 11/13/2020. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines/hearings are VACATED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Valerie Brooks. (Coelho, Thiago) Modified on 10/14/2020 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Loro Piana & C., Inc. on 9/4/2020, Answer due 11/3/2020 (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 KJM Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Becknal, R). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Loro Piana & C., Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Loro Piana & C., Inc. by Valerie Brooks. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9087165) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Loro Piana & C. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thiago M. Coelho