This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:07:40 (UTC).

Brooks v. Avancez

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Brooks filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Avancez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00515

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Brooks

Fort Wayne, IN 46803

Defendant

Avancez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Martha M Lemert

Attorney at Burt Blee Dixon Sutton & Bloom LLP

200 E Main St Ste 1000

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Brooks. Avancez served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (bas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(mr) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pre-Discovery Disclosures are due by 3/9/2020. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 9/4/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 6/30/2020, and from Defendant by 7/31/2020. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 3/30/2020 and as to Defendant 4/13/2020. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 10/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/30/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (shk) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lemert, Martha) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Avancez (Filing fee $ 400.00.) Receipt #INN1010821, filed by Linda Brooks.(bas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avancez. (Lemert, Martha) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#13

(#13) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Avancez.(Lemert, Martha) Modified on 1/28/2020 (rmf). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Parties' Planning Meeting filed by Plaintiff Linda Brooks. (lhc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#6

(#6) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Avancez ; answer due by 01/27/20. (Lemert, Martha) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Martha M Lemert on behalf of Avancez (Lemert, Martha) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Avancez of Fee Certification to Client of Fees and Expenses (Lemert, Martha) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Linda Brooks. (bas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pre-Discovery Disclosures are due by 3/9/2020. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 9/4/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 6/30/2020, and from Defendant by 7/31/2020. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 3/30/2020 and as to Defendant 4/13/2020. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 10/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/30/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (shk) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared pro se. Atty Martha Lemert appeared on behalf of Dft. The #11 Report of Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/20/2020. Court to issue Scheduling Order. (FTR 1st floor.)(copy mailed to pro se Pla) (mr) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Avancez.(Lemert, Martha) Modified on 1/28/2020 (rmf). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPORT of Parties' Planning Meeting filed by Plaintiff Linda Brooks. (lhc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lemert, Martha) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by Avancez of Fee Certification to Client of Fees and Expenses (Lemert, Martha) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avancez. (Lemert, Martha) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(mr) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reset Deadlines: Answer due 1/27/2020 per #6 Agreed Notice. (jld) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Avancez ; answer due by 01/27/20. (Lemert, Martha) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Martha M Lemert on behalf of Avancez (Lemert, Martha) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Brooks. Avancez served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (bas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Linda Brooks. (bas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Avancez. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (bas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Avancez (Filing fee $ 400.00.) Receipt #INN1010821, filed by Linda Brooks.(bas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.