This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2021 at 07:12:56 (UTC).

Brooks h/w v. ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Brooks h/w filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is PETRESE B. TUCKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02088

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETRESE B. TUCKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stanley M. and Nancy J. Brooks h/w

STANLEY M. BROOKS

NANCY J. BROOKS

Defendants

ZIMMER BIOMET, INC.

ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARY R. KATZ

226 West Market Street

West Chester, PA 19382

Defendant Attorney

MOLLY ELIZABETH FLYNN

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK VIA CM/ECF ELECTRONIC TRANSFER. (amas, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-26) THAT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULED ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1407 TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF 10/3/2018, AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE PAUL A. CROTTY. (amas, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HON. LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/7/21. 5/21/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE TO HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/14/21. 5/14/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ZIMMER BIOMET, INC..(FLYNN, MOLLY) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC..(FLYNN, MOLLY) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ZIMMER BIOMET, INC., ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15103762), filed by ZIMMER BIOMET, INC., ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(FLYNN, MOLLY) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zimmer Holdings Inc. is a litigant