This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2020 at 11:10:44 (UTC).

BROOKENS v. GAMBLE et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 BROOKENS filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against GAMBLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya S. Chutkan and Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01740

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Tanya S. Chutkan

Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENOIT BROOKENS

Defendants

ENGENE SCALIA

TIMOTHY DEANE

LARHONDA GAMBLE

LOCAL 12 AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Gony Frieder Goldberg

 

Court Documents

8 #4

Text of Proposed Order

8 #3

Exhibit 2

8 #2

Exhibit 1

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #3

Receipt

4 #2

Affidavit

4 #1

Receipt

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by LARHONDA GAMBLE, LOCAL 12 AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Gony) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: It appears from the docket that the Plaintiff has not properly effected service of the Complaint on the Defendants. The Court will not take up Plaintiff's #2 preliminary injunction motion unless and until the Complaint is properly served. Plaintiff is advised that he must serve the Complaint within 90 days of filing, see Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), and file proof of service on the docket. Failure to serve within the deadline may result in dismissal of the action. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/12/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case directly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper as related. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #6 Notice of Related Case was entered in error. See LCvR 5.1(a).(ztd) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 8/10/2020 ENTERED IN ERROR PER CHAMBERS OF TSC. . . . .NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LARHONDA GAMBLE, LOCAL 12 AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-00695. (Goldberg, Gony) Modified on 8/12/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court, including rules regarding service of process. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to : BENOIT BROOKENS, 10318 RIDGELINE DRIVE, MONTGOMERY VILLAGE, MD 20886. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/9/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT by BENOIT BROOKENS. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Affidavit, #3 Receipt)(ztd) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to TIMOTHY DEANE, LARHONDA GAMBLE, LOCAL 12 AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, ENGENE SCALIA. (ztd) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BENOIT BROOKENS (ztd) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against TIMOTHY DEANE, LARHONDA GAMBLE, LOCAL 12 AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, ENGENE SCALIA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616103402) with Jury Demand filed by BENOIT BROOKENS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less