This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2021 at 10:37:20 (UTC).

Brooke v. WFP Hospitality LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Brooke filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against WFP Hospitality LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Kendall J. Newman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa Brooke

Defendant

WFP Hospitality LLC Doing business as Holiday Inn Express & Suites Elk Grove Central

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Kristofer Strojnik

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Strojnik

2415 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorney

Catherine M. Corfee

Attorney at Corfee Stone & Associates

P.O. Box 1098

Carmichael, CA 95609

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SUPPLEMENT by WFP Hospitality LLC re #5 Answer to Complaint. (Corfee, Catherine) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ANSWER with Jury Demand by WFP Hospitality LLC.(Corfee, Catherine) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to 2/24/2021 to respond to the Complaint by WFP Hospitality LLC. Attorney Corfee, Catherine M. added. (Corfee, Catherine) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *WFP Hospitality LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter Kristofer Strojnik* *Esplanade Center III, Suite 700* *2415 East Camelback Road* *Phoenix, AZ 85016*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WFP Hospitality LLC by Theresa Brooke. Attorney Strojnik, Peter added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9367144) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT by WFP Hospitality LLC re #5 Answer to Complaint. (Corfee, Catherine) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Corfee, Catherine) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER with Jury Demand by WFP Hospitality LLC.(Corfee, Catherine) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to 2/24/2021 to respond to the Complaint by WFP Hospitality LLC. Attorney Corfee, Catherine M. added. (Corfee, Catherine) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *WFP Hospitality LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter Kristofer Strojnik* *Esplanade Center III, Suite 700* *2415 East Camelback Road* *Phoenix, AZ 85016*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against WFP Hospitality LLC by Theresa Brooke. Attorney Strojnik, Peter added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9367144) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer P. Kristofer Strojnik