This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2021 at 10:36:58 (UTC).

Brooke v. International Suites LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Brooke filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against International Suites LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa Brooke

Defendant

International Suites LLC Doing business as Holiday Inn Express & Suites Lincoln

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Kristofer Strojnik

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Strojnik

2415 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Theresa Brooke. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *International Suites LLC* (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

5 #1

Declaration

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to International Suites LLC by Theresa Brooke. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: International Suites LLC served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 02/14/2021)

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *International Suites LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter Kristofer Strojnik* *Esplanade Center III, Suite 700* *2415 East Camelback Road* *Phoenix, AZ 85016*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against International Suites LLC by Theresa Brooke. Attorney Strojnik, Peter added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9367039) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Theresa Brooke. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *International Suites LLC* (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to International Suites LLC by Theresa Brooke. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: International Suites LLC served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 02/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *International Suites LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter Kristofer Strojnik* *Esplanade Center III, Suite 700* *2415 East Camelback Road* *Phoenix, AZ 85016*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against International Suites LLC by Theresa Brooke. Attorney Strojnik, Peter added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9367039) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer P. Kristofer Strojnik