This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 04:06:39 (UTC).

Brooke v. Diamondrock Sonoma Owner LLC

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Brooke filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Diamondrock Sonoma Owner LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-06618

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa Brooke

Defendants

Diamondrock Sonoma Owner LLC

Renaissance Hotel Management Company LLC

Diamondrock Sonoma Owner LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as The Lodge at Sonoma Renaissance Resort & Spa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Kristofer Strojnik

Attorney at The Strojnik Firm LLC

Esplanade Center Iii, Suite 700, 2415 East Camelback Road

Phoenix, AZ 85016

P. Kristofer Strojnik

Attorney at The Strojnik Firm LLC

Esplanade Center Iii, Suite 700, 2415 East Camelback Road

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Theresa Brooke (Strojnik, P.) (Filed on 11/11/2019) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/18/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Renaissance Hotel Management Company LLC. Filed byTheresa Brooke. (Strojnik, P.) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Diamondrock Sonoma Owner LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Strojnik, Peter) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Diamondrock Sonoma Owner LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13795317.). Filed byTheresa Brooke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strojnik, Peter) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Theresa Brooke (Strojnik, P.) (Filed on 11/11/2019) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/18/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Renaissance Hotel Management Company LLC. Filed byTheresa Brooke. (Strojnik, P.) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Diamondrock Sonoma Owner LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Strojnik, Peter) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Diamondrock Sonoma Owner LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13795317.). Filed byTheresa Brooke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strojnik, Peter) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renaissance Hotel Management Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer P. Kristofer Strojnik