This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:55:31 (UTC).

Broner v. Todman et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Broner filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Todman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00111

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Broner

Waycross, GA 31503

Defendants

Cert. Ofc. Taylor

Tyrell Todman

Jeff Coleman

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Cover Letter

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Broner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of David Broner. Plaintiff's current custodian shall deduct the initial partial filing fee of $24.00 from Plaintiff's prison trust account. A copy of this Order and a copy of the #6 Consent to Collection shall be served upon the parties and Plaintiff's current custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/3/2020. (ca) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

6 #1

Envelope

1 #4

Envelope

2 #1

Envelope

1 #1

Statement of Claim 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Broner. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim 1, #2 Statement of Claim 2, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #2

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) CONSENT by Prisoner David Broner to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 1/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/9/2019. (ca) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of David Broner. Plaintiff's current custodian shall deduct the initial partial filing fee of $24.00 from Plaintiff's prison trust account. A copy of this Order and a copy of the #6 Consent to Collection shall be served upon the parties and Plaintiff's current custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/3/2020. (ca) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT by Prisoner David Broner to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by David Broner. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement, #2 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 1/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/9/2019. (ca) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Inmate Account Statement by David Broner. (ca) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Broner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Broner. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim 1, #2 Statement of Claim 2, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.