This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:22:24 (UTC).

Bromlow et al v. D & M Carriers, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Bromlow filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against D M Carriers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00195

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Matthew Bromlow

Johnny Walters

Benny Stewart

Defendant

D & M Carriers, LLC doing business as Freymiller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew C Helland

Attorney at Nichols Kaster LLP - SAN FRANCISCO

235 Montgomery St, Suite 810

San Francisco, CA 94104

Daniel S Brome

Attorney at Nichols Kaster LLP - SAN FRANCISCO

235 Montgomery St, Suite 810

San Francisco, CA 94104

Mark E Hammons

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Chad McNatt, Jr

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson & Feary, LLP

2 N Lake Ave Ste 560

Pasadena, CA 91101

Paige H Good

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Paul A Ross

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Paul D Root

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson & Feary PC

10 W Market St, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Karen B Reisinger

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson & Feary PC

10 W Market St, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Russell J Taylor, Jr

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson & Feary PC

10 W Market St, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

James H Hanson

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson & Feary PC

10 W Market St, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#93

#92

#91

#90

#89

#88

#87

#86

#85

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Notice of Eligibility

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) ORDER granting #92 Joint Motion to Stay Case. All deadlines in this case are STAYED and the 5/7/2020 scheduling conference is STRICKEN pending the California Supreme Courts issuance of an opinion. The parties file a Joint Status Report within 14 days after the California Supreme Court issues its decision in the Airlinecases. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/28/2020. (mb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) JOINT MOTION to Stay Case by D & M Carriers, LLC. (Hanson, James) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel S Brome on behalf of Matthew Bromlow, Benny Stewart, Johnny Walters (Brome, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2020 01:30 PM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 5/4/2020. (mb) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) ENTRY of Appearance by Russell J Taylor, Jr on behalf of D & M Carriers, LLC (Taylor, Russell) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) ENTRY of Appearance by Paul D Root on behalf of D & M Carriers, LLC (Root, Paul) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) ENTRY of Appearance by Karen B Reisinger on behalf of D & M Carriers, LLC (Reisinger, Karen) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) ENTRY of Appearance by James H Hanson on behalf of D & M Carriers, LLC (Hanson, James) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) ANSWER to Complaint by D & M Carriers, LLC.(Ross, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) ORDER granting #76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason T. Brown. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/17/2020. (mb) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jason T. Brown, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13720087) filed by Matthew Bromlow, Johnny Walters. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 9/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/14/2020.] [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 3/4/2020.] (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas R. Conlon ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13719980.) filed by Matthew Bromlow, Johnny Walters. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 9/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/14/2020.] [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 3/4/2020.] (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Matthew Bromlow, Johnny Walters (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 9/10/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/14/2020.] [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 3/4/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew Bromlow, Johnny Walters.. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 9/10/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/14/2020.] [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 3/4/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to D & M Carriers, LLC dba Freymiller. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/14/2020.] [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 3/4/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/25/2019 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 08/27/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #1 Notice of Eligibility) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 2/14/2020.] [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 3/4/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/14/2020.] [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 3/4/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Johnny Walters, Matthew Bromlow The Correct Cause of Act ion is 28:1332(d) Not Miscellaneous. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/14/2020.] [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 3/4/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 8/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/14/2020.] [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 3/4/2020.] (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; against D & M Carriers, LLC dba Freymiller. Filed byMatthew Bromlow, Johnny Walters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 8/26/2019) Modified on 8/27/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 2/14/2020.] [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 3/4/2020.] (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D & M Carriers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R. Jay Taylor Jr.