This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 at 07:01:28 (UTC).

Brodsky v. EBAY, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 Brodsky filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against EBAY, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-03443

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan van Keulen

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jay Brodsky

Great Neck, NY 11023

Defendants

PayPal Inc

EBAY, Inc.

Nael Yakoub

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EBAY, Inc., PayPal Inc, Nael Yakoub. Filed byJay Brodsky. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

7 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings RE #4 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another Judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/18/19. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jay Brodsky. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

5 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#7

(#7) Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Screening Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Amended complaint due by 8/19/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

6 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Screening Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Amended complaint due by 8/19/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings RE #4 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another Judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/18/19. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jay Brodsky. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against EBAY, Inc., PayPal Inc, Nael Yakoub. Filed byJay Brodsky. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.