This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 08:06:01 (UTC).

Brodrick v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Brodrick filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00466

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diana I Brodrick

Diana I. Brodrick

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores Inc.

Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust

Jim Clark

Not Classified By Court

C Erik Chickedantz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason R Delk

Attorney at Delk McNally LLP - Mun/IN

211 S Walnut St

Muncie, IN 47305

Defendant Attorneys

Cathleen M Shrader

Attorney at Barrett McNagny LLP

215 E Berry St, Po Box 2263

Fort Wayne, IN 46801

Robert T Keen, Jr

Attorney at Barrett McNagny LLP

215 E Berry St, Po Box 2263

Fort Wayne, IN 46801

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants Motion to Dismiss #7 is GRANTED. All claims against Clark are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 2/8/2022. (nhc) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R.Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 2/22/2022. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 11/22/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 7/13/2022; and from Defendant(s) by 8/30/2022. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 3/22/2022; as to Defendant(s) is 4/22/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 12/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/8/2022. (mrm) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#11

(#11) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Inc..(Keen, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jim Clark

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Jim Clark. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. The Parties should be prepared to address the diversity jurisdiction issue at the hearing. (mr) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Cathleen M Shrader on behalf of Jim Clark, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Shrader, Cathleen) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T Keen, Jr on behalf of Jim Clark, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

1 #7

Exhibit F - State Court Filings

1 #5

Exhibit D - Summons - Walmart Real Estate (AR)

1 #4

Exhibit C - Summons - Walmart Real Estate (IN)

1 #3

Exhibit B - Summons - Wal-Mart Stores Inc.

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants Motion to Dismiss #7 is GRANTED. All claims against Clark are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 2/8/2022. (nhc) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R.Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 2/22/2022. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 11/22/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 7/13/2022; and from Defendant(s) by 8/30/2022. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 3/22/2022; as to Defendant(s) is 4/22/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 12/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/8/2022. (mrm) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/8/2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Jason Delk. Dft appeared by atty Cathleen Shrader. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Erik Chickedantz appointed as mediator. Atty Shrader to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Delk. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/1/2022. (FTR 1st Floor) (mrm) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Inc..(Keen, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEF in Support of #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jim Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jim Clark)(Keen, Robert) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Jim Clark. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. The Parties should be prepared to address the diversity jurisdiction issue at the hearing. (mr) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nhc) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Cathleen M Shrader on behalf of Jim Clark, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Shrader, Cathleen) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T Keen, Jr on behalf of Jim Clark, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Keen, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4782323.) from Huntington Superior Court, Cause No. 35D01-2111-PL-000707, filed by Jim Clark, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons - Wal-Mart Stores Inc., #4 Exhibit C - Summons - Walmart Real Estate (IN), #5 Exhibit D - Summons - Walmart Real Estate (AR), #6 Exhibit E - Summons - Jim Clark, #7 Exhibit F - State Court Filings)(Keen, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason R. Delk