This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/18/2020 at 09:57:47 (UTC).

Brockway et al v. Ojeyemi

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 Brockway filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Ojeyemi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01868

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kurt Brockway

Meagan Brockway

Defendant

Ojedapo Ojeyemi, M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barry J Nace

Attorney at Paulson and Nace, PLLC

1025 Thomas Jefferson Street, Nw, Ste 810

Washington, DC 20007

Matthew Andrew Nace

Attorney at Paulson and Nace PLLC

1025 Thomas Jefferson Street Nw, Suite 810

Washington, DC 20007

Defendant Attorney

Catherine Whitehurst Steiner

Attorney at Pessin Katz Law PA

901 Dulaney Valley Rd Ste 400

Towson, MD 21204

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Amended SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/9/2021.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/22/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION to Modify The Scheduling Order & Meet and Confer Report by Kurt Brockway, Meagan Brockway(Nace, Matthew) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Andrew Nace on behalf of Kurt Brockway, Meagan Brockway (Nace, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#8

(#8) LETTER ORDER that the Court has scheduled a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call on July 20, 2020 at 4:45 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/30/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

7 #1

Initial Discovery Protocols

#7

(#7) DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/16/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/30/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ojedapo Ojeyemi, MD (Steiner, Catherine) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ojedapo Ojeyemi, MD.(Steiner, Catherine) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#3

(#3) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/19/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Ojedapo Ojeyemi, MD.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

1 #2

Summons Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8711763.), filed by Meagan Brockway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Nace, Barry) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Amended SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/9/2021.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/22/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION to Modify The Scheduling Order & Meet and Confer Report by Kurt Brockway, Meagan Brockway(Nace, Matthew) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Defensibility (Steiner, Catherine) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Andrew Nace on behalf of Kurt Brockway, Meagan Brockway (Nace, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER ORDER that the Court has scheduled a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call on July 20, 2020 at 4:45 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/30/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/16/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/30/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ojedapo Ojeyemi, MD (Steiner, Catherine) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ojedapo Ojeyemi, MD.(Steiner, Catherine) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/19/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Ojedapo Ojeyemi, MD.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8711763.), filed by Meagan Brockway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Nace, Barry) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry J. Nace

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Nace