This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2019 at 07:32:43 (UTC).

Brock v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Brock filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary K. Dimke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00063

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary K. Dimke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald William Morgan Brock

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dana Chris Madsen

Attorney at Law Office of Dana C Madsen

301 W Indiana Avenue, P O Box 2157

Spokane, WA 99210-2157

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Lane Martin

Attorney at Social Security Administration - SEA

701 5Th Avenue, Suite 2900

Seattle, WA 98104

Timothy Michael Durkin

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office - SPO

920 W Riverside Suite 300, P O Box 1494

Spokane, WA 99210-1494

 

Court Documents

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#8

(#8) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Justin Lane Martin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Martin, Justin) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald William Morgan Brock re Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Madsen, Dana) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 3/7/2019 (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • (#3) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Donald William Morgan Brock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Madsen, Dana) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.