This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2021 at 08:31:26 (UTC).

BROCK v. COLOPLAST CORP.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 BROCK filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COLOPLAST CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-18726

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELAINE BROCK

Defendant

COLOPLAST CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEFANIE LYNN COLELLA-WALSH

Attorney at STARK & STARK

993 Lenox Drive, Building Two

Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

Defendant Attorneys

TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY

Attorney at SCHENCK, PRICE, SMITH & KING LLP

220 Park Avenue, Po Box 991

Florham Park, NJ 07932

MARK K. SILVER

Attorney at SCHENCK PRICE SMITH & KING

220 Park Avenue

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

5 #3

Certificate of Service

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Fredona w Cert of Good Standing

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Fredona, Esq. by ELAINE BROCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Fredona w Cert of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(COLELLA-WALSH, STEFANIE) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of COLOPLAST CORP. (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY on behalf of COLOPLAST CORP. (DUFFY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COLOPLAST CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11797690) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELAINE BROCK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COLELLA-WALSH, STEFANIE) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Fredona, Esq.. Motion set for 3/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Fredona, Esq. by ELAINE BROCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Fredona w Cert of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(COLELLA-WALSH, STEFANIE) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of COLOPLAST CORP. (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY on behalf of COLOPLAST CORP. (DUFFY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COLOPLAST CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11797690) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELAINE BROCK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COLELLA-WALSH, STEFANIE) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLOPLAST CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARK K. SILVER