This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 08:37:11 (UTC).

Brock USA, LLC v. Fieldturf USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Brock USA, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fieldturf USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00224

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brock USA, LLC doing business as Brock International LLC

Defendants

Fieldturf USA, Inc.

Tarkett Sports Canada Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Micah Benjamin Hensley

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

600 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Puja Patel Lea

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

600 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Brian E. Haan

Attorney at Lee Sheikh Megley & Haan

111 W Jackson Blvd, Suite 2230

Chicago, IL 60604

Christopher J. Lee

Attorney at Lee Sheikh Megley & Haan

111 W Jackson Blvd, Suite 2230

Chicago, IL 60604

David J. Sheikh

Attorney at Lee Sheikh Megley & Haan

111 W Jackson Blvd, Suite 2230

Chicago, IL 60604

Dragan Gjorgiev

Attorney at Lee Sheikh Megley & Haan

111 W Jackson Blvd, Suite 2230

Chicago, IL 60604

Eric Pettis

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

600 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Lindsay Mitchell Henner

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP

600 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Defendant Attorney

Michael Joseph Sullivan

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP-Atl

Suite 2400, 271 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363-1017

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that the deadline by which Defendants FieldTurf USA, Inc. and Tarkett Sports Canada Inc. must answer, move or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended through and including February 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/17/21. (ceo) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Sullivan on behalf of Fieldturf USA, Inc., Tarkett Sports Canada Inc. (Sullivan, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#11

(#11) Return of Service Executed by Brock USA, LLC. Fieldturf USA, Inc. served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Sheikh, David) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#10

(#10) Return of Service Executed by Brock USA, LLC. Tarkett Sports Canada Inc. served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Sheikh, David) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brock USA, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11424967) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2021: #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) (jpa). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that the deadline by which Defendants FieldTurf USA, Inc. and Tarkett Sports Canada Inc. must answer, move or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended through and including February 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/17/21. (ceo) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Fieldturf USA, Inc., Tarkett Sports Canada Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Sullivan on behalf of Fieldturf USA, Inc., Tarkett Sports Canada Inc. (Sullivan, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Return of Service Executed by Brock USA, LLC. Fieldturf USA, Inc. served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Sheikh, David) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service Executed by Brock USA, LLC. Tarkett Sports Canada Inc. served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Sheikh, David) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dragan Gjorgiev. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/8/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Dragan Gjorgiev Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11435633). Attorney Dragan Gjorgiev added appearing on behalf of Brock USA, LLC (gas) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Christopher Lee as to Brock USA, LLC regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Lee and GRANTING #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian E. Haan. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/8/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher J. Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11435551). Attorney Christopher J. Lee added appearing on behalf of Brock USA, LLC (gas) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Dragan Gjorgiev Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11435633). with Brief In Support by Brock USA, LLC. (Lea, Puja) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission of Brian E. Haan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11435616). with Brief In Support by Brock USA, LLC. (Lea, Puja) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of David J. Sheikh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11435598). with Brief In Support by Brock USA, LLC. (Lea, Puja) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher J. Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11435551). with Brief In Support by Brock USA, LLC. (Lea, Puja) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Brock USA, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Fieldturf USA, Inc., Tarkett Sports Canada Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Tarkett Summons)(jpa) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Brock USA, LLC. (jpa) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jpa) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brock USA, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11424967) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2021: #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) (jpa). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIELDTURF USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL J. SULLIVAN