This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2021 at 08:43:05 (UTC).

BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS LLC et al v. THE SALEM GROUP, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against THE SALEM GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are CATHERINE C. EAGLES and JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00382

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CATHERINE C. EAGLES

Referral Judge

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS LLC

AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL SALES PTE. LIMITED

Defendants

DAVID ROSENBLATT

THE SALEM GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN F. MORROW, JR.

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

One West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

JOHN D. WOOTEN, IV

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

300 N. Greene Street, Suite 1900

Greensboro, NC 27401

Defendant Attorneys

CANDACE SCOTT FRIEL

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

380 Knollwood St., Suite 530

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

GROVER GRAY WILSON

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

380 Knollwood Street, Suite 580

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

#13

#8

7 #1

Consent Form

#7

6 #1

Summons - David Rosenblatt

#6

#4

#3

#2

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Supporting BRIEF to #19 Motion for More Definite Statement, filed by THE SALEM GROUP, INC. (WILSON, GROVER) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correct docket entry relationship. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for More Definite Statement by THE SALEM GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 7/19/2021 (WILSON, GROVER) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REVISED STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Winchester, Robin) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 06/04/2021, that the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #14 ] is GRANTED, and the time for Defendants, The Salem Group and David Rosenblatt, to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint in this action is and shall be extended to and including the 28th day of June, 2021. (Taylor, Abby) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JOHN D. WOOTEN, IV on behalf of Plaintiffs AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL SALES PTE. LIMITED, BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS LLC (WOOTEN, JOHN) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Referred: RE: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant THE SALEM GROUP, INC. (FRIEL, CANDACE) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by DAVID ROSENBLATT, THE SALEM GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FRIEL, CANDACE) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CANDACE SCOTT FRIEL on behalf of Defendants DAVID ROSENBLATT, THE SALEM GROUP, INC. (FRIEL, CANDACE) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney GROVER GRAY WILSON on behalf of Defendants DAVID ROSENBLATT, THE SALEM GROUP, INC. (WILSON, GROVER) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT by AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL SALES PTE. LIMITED. Amendment to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a) . (MORROW, JOHN) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to THE SALEM GROUP, INC., DAVID ROSENBLATT. (Attachments: #1 Summons - David Rosenblatt) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JOHN F. MORROW, JR on behalf of Plaintiffs AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL SALES PTE. LIMITED, BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS LLC (MORROW, JOHN) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL SALES PTE. LIMITED. (MORROW, JOHN) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS LLC. (MORROW, JOHN) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT [JURY TRIAL DEMANDED] against DAVID ROSENBLATT, THE SALEM GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3048693.), filed by BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS LLC, AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL SALES PTE. LIMITED.(MORROW, JOHN) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less