This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 07:52:44 (UTC).

Broadhead v. McElmore et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Broadhead filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against McElmore. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R David Proctor and John H England, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00326

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R David Proctor

Referral Judge

John H England, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Broadhead

Bessemer, AL 35023

Defendants

McElmore

Teague

R Gadsden

Alabama Department of Corrections

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, R Gadsden, McElmore, Teague, filed by James Broadhead.(KAM) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Broadhead. (KAM) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER The plaintiff has paid only $400.00 of the $402.00 filing fee; plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the remaining $2.00 of the filing fee within 30 days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/16/2022. (KAM) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to the court of requesting the Warden to sent $2.00 by James Broadhead (KAM) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to the court of requesting the Warden to sent $2.00 by James Broadhead (KAM) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER The plaintiff has paid only $400.00 of the $402.00 filing fee; plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the remaining $2.00 of the filing fee within 30 days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/16/2022. (KAM) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketPartial Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number H4601005130 (KAM) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketPartial Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number H4601005130 (AHI) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Broadhead. (KAM) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, R Gadsden, McElmore, Teague, filed by James Broadhead.(KAM) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teague is a litigant

Latest cases where Alabama Department of Corrections is a litigant