This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 17:06:06 (UTC).

Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. Arlies LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 Broadcast Music Incorporated filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Arlies LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04974

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated

Iron Tigga Music

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation

Broadcast Music Incorporated

Sony/ATV Song LLC

Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC

EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated

CKJointz Music

Sony/ATV Song LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Melody

Defendants

Arlies LLC

Arlana J Wagenblast

Arlies LLC doing business as Arlie's Bar & Grill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark M Deatherage

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER: Any Motion for Default Judgment must be filed within 15 days of the date of this order. If counsel fails to file a Motion for Default Judgment within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. See document for further details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/7/19. (GMP) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#17

(#17) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Arlies LLC, Arlana J Wagenblast. (MSA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

16 #1

Clerk's Entry of Default

#16

(#16) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation against Arlana J. Wagenblast. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Entry of Default)(Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

15 #1

Clerk's Entry of Default

#15

(#15) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation against Arlies, LLC dba Arlie's Bar and Grill. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Entry of Default)(Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#13

(#13) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, MIDP upon Arlies, LLC on 08/20/2019. (Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#12

(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, MIDP upon Arlana Wagenblast on 08/20/2019. (Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on November 15, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/16/19. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/16/19. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

8 #1

Summons

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Arlies LLC, Arlana J Wagenblast. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Iron Tigga Music. (KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17286647. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4974-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: Any Motion for Default Judgment must be filed within 15 days of the date of this order. If counsel fails to file a Motion for Default Judgment within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. See document for further details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/7/19. (GMP) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Arlies LLC, Arlana J Wagenblast. (MSA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation against Arlana J. Wagenblast. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Entry of Default)(Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation against Arlies, LLC dba Arlie's Bar and Grill. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Entry of Default)(Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, MIDP upon Arlies, LLC on 08/20/2019. (Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, MIDP upon Arlana Wagenblast on 08/20/2019. (Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on November 15, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/16/19. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/16/19. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Arlies LLC, Arlana J Wagenblast. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Iron Tigga Music. (KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17286647. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4974-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Iron Tigga Music, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Song LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark) (KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17286647 filed by Sony/ATV Song LLC, Iron Tigga Music, Fonohits Music Publishing Incorporated, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Broadcast Music Incorporated, CKJointz Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Broadcast Music, Inc. is a litigant