This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:54:24 (UTC).

Broadcast Music Inc v. Hound House Hospitality Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Broadcast Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Hound House Hospitality Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ada Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02365

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eldorotto Music Publishing

Paul Simon Music

Songs of Universal Inc

Round Hill Music LP

Rising Gorge Music

Big Gassed Hitties

Noah's Little Boat Music

Spirit Music Group Inc

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

EMI Blackwood Music Inc

Sea Gayle Music LLC

Lost Boys Music

Tokeco Tunes

Lucky Thumb Music

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp

Broadcast Music Inc

Defendants

Monica L Millson

Hound House Hospitality Inc

Troy D Christopher

John A Millson

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Myall S Hawkins

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

700 Milam St., Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

V Elizabeth Kellow

Attorney at Marshall & Kellow, LLP

4099 Mcewen Ste 400

Dallas, TX 75244

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by V Elizabeth Kellow on behalf of Broadcast Music Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kellow, V) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by Broadcast Music Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Troy D Christopher, Hound House Hospitality Inc, John A Millson, Monica L Millson. (sre) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#7

(#7) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Tegna, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - Troy D. Christopher filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - Monica L. Millson filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - John A. Millson filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - Hound House Hospitality filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10315726) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by V Elizabeth Kellow on behalf of Broadcast Music Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kellow, V) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #9 Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/16/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by Broadcast Music Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Troy D Christopher, Hound House Hospitality Inc, John A Millson, Monica L Millson. (sre) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Tegna, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - Troy D. Christopher filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - Monica L. Millson filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - John A. Millson filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - Hound House Hospitality filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10315726) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spirit Music Group, Inc. dba Spirit of Nashville One is a litigant

Latest cases where Round Hill Music, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant