This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 14:19:43 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Wentling

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Wentling. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan M. Bazis and Joseph F. Bataillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00238

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan M. Bazis

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pie Eyed Groobee Music

Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co.

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Round Hill Music LP

Rising Gorge Music

Groobee Entertainment

Northside Partners

Tokeco Tunes

Round Hill Carlin LLC

Constant Pressure Publishing

EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.

Peermusic III Ltd.

Showbilly Music

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Round Hill Music LP doing business as Round Hill Works

Groobee Entertainment, Inc.

Round Hill Carlin LLC doing business as Edward B. Marks Music Company

Defendants

Doris E. Wentling

Beaver City, NE 68926

Doris E. Wentling individually and doing business as The Beaver Bar & Grill

Beaver City, NE 68926

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jill R. Ackerman

Attorney at BAIRD, HOLM LAW FIRM

1700 Farnam Street, Suite 1500

Omaha, NE 68102-2068

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 11/1/2019. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Telephone Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 03:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#36

(#36) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jill R. Ackerman on behalf of Plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., Constant Pressure Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Peermusic III Ltd., Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Rising Gorge Music, Round Hill Carlin LLC, Round Hill Music LP, Showbilly Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#35

RESTRICTED

#34

(#34) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#32

(#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Doris E. Wentling on 6/7/2019. (Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#31

(#31) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jill R. Ackerman on behalf of Plaintiff Tokeco Tunes.(Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#30

(#30) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jill R. Ackerman on behalf of Plaintiff Rising Gorge Music.(Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#29

(#29) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jill R. Ackerman on behalf of Plaintiff Showbilly Music.(Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to defendant Doris E. Wentling. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (ADB) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Requested as to Doris E. Wentling, individually and d/b/a The Beaver Bar & Grill regarding Complaint, #1 . (Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#1

(#2) Summons Requested as to Doris E. Wentling, individually and d/b/a The Beaver Bar & Grill regarding Complaint, #1 . (Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 11/1/2019. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Telephone Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 03:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • (#37) TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jill R. Ackerman on behalf of Plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., Constant Pressure Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Peermusic III Ltd., Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Rising Gorge Music, Round Hill Carlin LLC, Round Hill Music LP, Showbilly Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ANSWER to Complaint by Doris E. Wentling in her individual capacity only. (LKO) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Doris E. Wentling on 6/7/2019. (Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jill R. Ackerman on behalf of Plaintiff Tokeco Tunes.(Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jill R. Ackerman on behalf of Plaintiff Rising Gorge Music.(Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jill R. Ackerman on behalf of Plaintiff Showbilly Music.(Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#10) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Peermusic III Ltd.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#9) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#8) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#7) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Constant Pressure Publishing. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#6) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to defendant Doris E. Wentling. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (ADB) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint. ) (ADB) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • (#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Requested as to Doris E. Wentling, individually and d/b/a The Beaver Bar & Grill regarding Complaint, #1 . (Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3949116), by Attorney Jill R. Ackerman on behalf of Showbilly Music, Constant Pressure Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Round Hill Music LP, Peermusic III Ltd., Broadcast Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Rising Gorge Music, Round Hill Carlin LLC, Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co.(Ackerman, Jill) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Round Hill Music, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Peermusic III, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant