This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2022 at 08:02:52 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Walkinstown, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Walkinstown, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04029

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Benny Bird Company, Inc.

Stone Diamond Music Corp.

Escatawpa Songs, LLC

Sony/ATV Songs, LLC

Defendants

Walkinstown, Inc. doing business as Scallywags Irish Pub & Restaurant

Michael Doyle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathon Brugh Lower

Attorney at Gibbons P.C. (NY)

One Pennsylvania Plaza, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Doyle, Walkinstown, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26157271)Document filed by Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Benny Bird Company, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc., Corporate Parent Gray Television Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA, Corporate Parent Pershing Square Holdings, Corporate Parent Tencent Holdings Ltd. for Songs of Universal, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs, LLC; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for Stone Diamond Music Corp.. Document filed by Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp...(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#4

(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walkinstown, Inc. d/b/a Scallywag's Irish Pub & Restaurant, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp...(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Doyle, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp...(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walkinstown, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Doyle..(pc) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#9

(#9) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Walkinstown, Inc. served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouskey, authorized agent in the office of the Secretary of State of New York. Document filed by Sony/ATV Songs, LLC; Stone Diamond Music Corp.; Broadcast Music, Inc.; Benny Bird Company, Inc.; Songs of Universal, Inc.; Escatawpa Songs, LLC..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Michael Doyle served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. Service was accepted by Ro Duffy, co-worker. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sony/ATV Songs, LLC; Stone Diamond Music Corp.; Broadcast Music, Inc.; Benny Bird Company, Inc.; Songs of Universal, Inc.; Escatawpa Songs, LLC..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Michael Doyle served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. Service was accepted by Ro Duffy, co-worker. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sony/ATV Songs, LLC; Stone Diamond Music Corp.; Broadcast Music, Inc.; Benny Bird Company, Inc.; Songs of Universal, Inc.; Escatawpa Songs, LLC..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Walkinstown, Inc. served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouskey, authorized agent in the office of the Secretary of State of New York. Document filed by Sony/ATV Songs, LLC; Stone Diamond Music Corp.; Broadcast Music, Inc.; Benny Bird Company, Inc.; Songs of Universal, Inc.; Escatawpa Songs, LLC..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Doyle..(pc) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walkinstown, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Doyle, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp...(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walkinstown, Inc. d/b/a Scallywag's Irish Pub & Restaurant, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp...(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc., Corporate Parent Gray Television Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA, Corporate Parent Pershing Square Holdings, Corporate Parent Tencent Holdings Ltd. for Songs of Universal, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs, LLC; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for Stone Diamond Music Corp.. Document filed by Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp...(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Doyle, Walkinstown, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26157271)Document filed by Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Benny Bird Company, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Benny Bird Company, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Escatawpa Songs L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where Stone Diamond Music Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony/ATV Songs LLC is a litigant