This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:41:43 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. W 151 LLC, et al.,

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against W 151 LLC, . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah Barnes and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00478

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Crompton Songs

Gibb Brothers Music

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.

Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc.

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC

Coburn Music, Inc.

Beechwood Music Corporation

Sony/ATV Songs LLC Doing business as Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. Doing business as EMI Longitude Music

Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc. Doing business as Songs of Kobalt Music Publishing

Defendants

W 151 LLC

Adelio Walden

Whisk

Dale Walden

Jerry Wolfe

W 151 LLC Doing business as Whisky Barrel Tavern also known as Whisk(e)y Barrel

Whisk(e)y Barrel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karen S. Frank

Attorney at Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass

One Montgomery Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Foram Dave

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass Llp

One Montgomery Street, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Thomas Andrews Harvey

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Consent Form

4 #2

Copyright Report

4 #3

Order re Filing Requirements

4 #4

VDRP

4 #5

Copyright Schedule

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Thomas Andrews Harvey on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney Harvey, Thomas Andrews added. (Harvey, Thomas) Modified on 3/13/2020 (Huang, H). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Foram Dave on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney Dave, Foram added. (Dave, Foram) Modified on 3/13/2020 (Huang, H). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jerry Wolfe served on 3/10/2020. (Frank, Karen) Modified on 3/11/2020 (Huang, H). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Adelio Walden served on 3/8/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Frank, Karen) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: W 151 LLC served on 3/8/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Frank, Karen) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* RE 340-032 * * Shout * * O'Kelley Isley; Ronald Isley; Rudolph Isley * Copyright #2:* Eu 761684 * * Stayin' Alive aka Staying Alive * * Barry Gibb; Robin Gibb; Maurice Gibb * Copyright #3:* PA 596-931 * * Watermelon Crawl * * Buddy Brock; Zack Turner * Copyright #4:* Eu 846121 * * We Will Rock You * * Brian May * Copyright #5:* PA 934-438 * * Suavemento * * Elvis Crespo *; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 Order re Filing Requirements, #4 VDRP, #5 Copyright Schedule) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *W 151 LLC, Adelio Walden, Jerry Wolfe* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Karen S. Frank* *Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass* *One Montgomery Street, Suite 3000* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs. (Frank, Karen) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against all defendants by all plaintiffs. Attorney Frank, Karen S. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8772334) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frank, Karen) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Beechwood Music Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where KOBALT MUSIC PUBLISHING AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated is a litigant