This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:25:35 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. TWMF, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against TWMF, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelva Gonzales Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00035

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelva Gonzales Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Black Casper Music

Peer International Corporation

Ish Music

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Plunkrock Music

Beechwood Music Corporation

Lynch Mob Music

Defendants

Jason Masek

TWMF, Inc.

TWMF, Inc. doing business as The Tavern Corpus Christi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Myall S Hawkins

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLp

700 Milam Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Sharad Kotagiri Bijanki

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

700 Milam Street, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 7/9/2020. Initial Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference Dates by Beechwood Music Corporation, Black Casper Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Ish Music, Lynch Mob Music, Peer International Corporation, Plunkrock Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

6 #1

Return of Service - Jason Masek

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service - Jason Masek)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#5

(#5) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (dterrell, 2) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beechwood Music Corporation, Black Casper Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Ish Music, Lynch Mob Music, Peer International Corporation, Plunkrock Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., filed.(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jason Masek, TWMF, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24081892) filed by Black Casper Music, Peer International Corporation, Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Ish Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Plunkrock Music, Lynch Mob Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 7/9/2020. Initial Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference Dates by Beechwood Music Corporation, Black Casper Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Ish Music, Lynch Mob Music, Peer International Corporation, Plunkrock Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service - Jason Masek)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (dterrell, 2) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beechwood Music Corporation, Black Casper Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Ish Music, Lynch Mob Music, Peer International Corporation, Plunkrock Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., filed.(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jason Masek, TWMF, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24081892) filed by Black Casper Music, Peer International Corporation, Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Ish Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Plunkrock Music, Lynch Mob Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beechwood Music Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Peer International Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Broadcast Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Songs of Universal, Inc. is a litigant