This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2022 at 10:42:31 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc., et al. v. The Green Triangle, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Green Triangle, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Candy W Dale and David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00264

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Candy W Dale

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music

Rick Springfield Music

Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

Jeff Diggs Music

EMI Blackwood Music Inc.

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Lucky Thumb Music

Noah's Little Boat Music

Eldorotto Music Publishing

Big Gassed Hitties

Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Tree Publishing

Universal Music MGB NA LLC doing business as Universal Music Careers

Sea Gayle Music LLC doing business as New Songs of Sea Gayle

Defendant

Corey Hillman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brad P Miller

Attorney at HAWLEY TROXELL ENNIS & HAWLEY

Po Box 1617

Boise, ID 83701

Defendant Attorneys

Gary Lee Cooper

Attorney at COOPER and LARSEN

Po Box 4229

Pocatello, ID 83205-4229

John David Oborn

151 N 3Rd Ave - 2Nd Floor

Pocatello, ID 83205

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate TEGNA, Other Affiliate Gray Television, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Miller, Brad)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Complaint

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Summons for Corey Hillman

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of Service filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. . (Miller, Brad)

#7

(#7) Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by The Green Triangle, LLC.(Oborn, John)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Big Gassed Hitties, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Eldorotto Music Publishing, Corey Hillman, Jeff Diggs Music, Lucky Thumb Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Rick Springfield Music, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc., The Green Triangle, LLC, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. re #1 Complaint and #7 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/14/2022. (jd)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Green Triangle, LLC. (Oborn, John)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Green Triangle, LLC. (Oborn, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Big Gassed Hitties, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Eldorotto Music Publishing, Corey Hillman, Jeff Diggs Music, Lucky Thumb Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Rick Springfield Music, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc., The Green Triangle, LLC, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. re #1 Complaint and #7 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/14/2022. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by The Green Triangle, LLC.(Oborn, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Service filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. . (Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons for Corey Hillman)(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 4:22-cv-00264-DCN for all future filings. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate TEGNA, Other Affiliate Gray Television, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BIDDC-2414025.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Sheet)(Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sea Gayle Music, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated is a litigant