This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2022 at 09:32:05 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Tbow's Tavern, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Tbow's Tavern, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine A Crytzer and Susan K Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00079

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine A Crytzer

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Crooked Chimney Music, Inc.

EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.

Jacaboy Songs

Hip City Music Inc.

HiFrost Publishing

Defendants

Tbow's Tavern, LLC d/b/a Tbow's Tavern

Tina Bowman

Tbow's Tavern, LLC doing business as Tbow's Tavern

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ian Garrett McFarland

Attorney at Merchant & Gould, P.C. (Knox)

800 S Gay Street, Suite 2150

Knoxville, TN 37929

Defendant Attorney

H Franklin Chancey

Attorney at Chancey, Kanavos

Po Box 42, 121 Broad Street Sw

Cleveland, TN 37311

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Song Schedule

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons Tebow's Tavern

1 #4

Summons Bowman

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Broadcast Music, Inc., Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., HiFrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Jacaboy Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc.. (McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Summons - Tina Bowman

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/7/2022. (JCK) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/7/2022. (JCK) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/7/2022. (JCK) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hip City Music Inc., Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., HiFrost Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Jacaboy Songs. Tbow's Tavern, LLC served on 4/19/2022. (McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hip City Music Inc., Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., HiFrost Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Jacaboy Songs. Tina Bowman served on 4/19/2022. (McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tbow's Tavern, LLC, Tina Bowman.(Chancey, H) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 5/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 notice of consent/non-consent) (DJH) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tbow's Tavern, LLC, Tina Bowman.(Chancey, H) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hip City Music Inc., Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., HiFrost Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Jacaboy Songs. Tina Bowman served on 4/19/2022. (McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hip City Music Inc., Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., HiFrost Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Jacaboy Songs. Tbow's Tavern, LLC served on 4/19/2022. (McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/7/2022. (JCK) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/7/2022. (JCK) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/7/2022. (JCK) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Tbow's Tavern, LLC, Tina Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Tina Bowman)(JCK) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDistrict Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JCK) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Broadcast Music, Inc., Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., HiFrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Jacaboy Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc.. (McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tbow's Tavern, LLC, Tina Bowman ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5025879.), filed by Hip City Music Inc., Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., HiFrost Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Jacaboy Songs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Song Schedule, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Tebow's Tavern, #4 Summons Bowman)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crooked Chimney Music Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HIP CITY MUSIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Broadcast Music, Inc. is a litigant