This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 12:33:53 (UTC).

Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Sweetwater Beverage Club et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Broadcast Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Sweetwater Beverage Club. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00995

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eldorotto Music Publishing

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Counting Crows LLC

Big Gassed Hitties

Noah's Little Boat Music

Spirit Music Group Inc

R-Key Darcus Publishing

EMI Blackwood Music Inc

Sea Gayle Music LLC

Orbi-Lee Publishing

Lucky Thumb Music

Magic Knee Music

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp

Roys Boys LLC

Broadcast Music Inc

Spirit Music Group Inc doing business as Spirit Of Nashville One

Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music

Defendants

Christopher M Young

Sweetwater Beverage Club

Sweetwater Beverage Club doing business as Sweetwater Grill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip Tarpley

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3600

Dallas, TX 75201-7932

Dan Duncan Davison

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3600

Dallas, TX 75201-2784

Christian Celeste Nisttahuz

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3600

Dallas, TX 75201-7932

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Report to Copyright Office of Final Order. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (rekc) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Big Gassed Hitties, Broadcast Music Inc, Counting Crows LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eldorotto Music Publishing, Lucky Thumb Music, Magic Knee Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darcus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Rule 11 Agreement filed by Big Gassed Hitties, Broadcast Music Inc, Counting Crows LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eldorotto Music Publishing, Lucky Thumb Music, Magic Knee Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darcus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Agreement to Extend Answer Deadline filed by Big Gassed Hitties, Broadcast Music Inc, Counting Crows LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eldorotto Music Publishing, Lucky Thumb Music, Magic Knee Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darcus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Christopher M Young; served on 4/27/2019. (ykp) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sweetwater Beverage Club; served on 4/27/2019. (ykp) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Sweetwater Beverage Club, Christopher M. Young. (ndt) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (ndt) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Big Gassed Hitties, Broadcast Music, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Eldorotto Music Publishing, Lucky Thumb Music, Magic Knee Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darcus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. ; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Spirit Services Holdings SARL for Spirit Music Group Inc.; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Tegna, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sweetwater Beverage Club, Christopher M Young filed by Counting Crows LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Eldorotto Music Publishing, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Roys Boys LLC, Magic Knee Music, Lucky Thumb Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Spirit Music Group Inc, R-Key Darcus Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Big Gassed Hitties, Orbi-Lee Publishing. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9941982) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Report to Copyright Office of Final Order. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (rekc) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (rekc) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Big Gassed Hitties, Broadcast Music Inc, Counting Crows LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eldorotto Music Publishing, Lucky Thumb Music, Magic Knee Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darcus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Rule 11 Agreement filed by Big Gassed Hitties, Broadcast Music Inc, Counting Crows LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eldorotto Music Publishing, Lucky Thumb Music, Magic Knee Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darcus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Agreement to Extend Answer Deadline filed by Big Gassed Hitties, Broadcast Music Inc, Counting Crows LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eldorotto Music Publishing, Lucky Thumb Music, Magic Knee Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darcus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Christopher M Young; served on 4/27/2019. (ykp) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sweetwater Beverage Club; served on 4/27/2019. (ykp) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Sweetwater Beverage Club, Christopher M. Young. (ndt) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (ndt) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Big Gassed Hitties, Broadcast Music, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Eldorotto Music Publishing, Lucky Thumb Music, Magic Knee Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darcus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. ; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Spirit Services Holdings SARL for Spirit Music Group Inc.; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Tegna, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sweetwater Beverage Club, Christopher M Young filed by Counting Crows LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Eldorotto Music Publishing, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Roys Boys LLC, Magic Knee Music, Lucky Thumb Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Spirit Music Group Inc, R-Key Darcus Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Big Gassed Hitties, Orbi-Lee Publishing. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9941982) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roys Boys LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Spirit Music Group, Inc. dba Spirit of Nashville One is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTING CROWS, LLC d/b/a JONES FALLS MUSIC is a litigant