This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 07:25:46 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Spankies, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Spankies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co.

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.

Cyanide Publishing

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Peermusic III LTD.

House of Cash, Inc.

House of Bryant Publications, LLC

Bocephus Music, Inc.

Sinnerlina

Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Tree Publishing

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music

Defendants

Jon Josephson

Spankies, LLC

Spankies, LLC doing business as Spankies

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ian Garrett McFarland

Attorney at Merchant & Gould P.C. (Knoxville Office)

800 S. Gay Street, Suite 2150

Knoxville, TN 37929

R. Bradford Brittian

Attorney at Merchant & Gould P.C. (Knoxville Office)

800 S. Gay Street, Suite 2150

Knoxville, TN 37929

John T. Winemiller

Attorney at Merchant & Gould P.C. (Knoxville Office)

800 S. Gay Street, Suite 2150

Knoxville, TN 37929

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Schedule

1 #2

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/14/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Jon Josephson served on 1/11/2020. (McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Spankies, LLC served on 1/10/2020. (McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons issued as to Jon Josephson and Spankies, LLC. (gb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 01:30 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Ian Garrett McFarland, R. Bradford Brittian and John T. Winemiller. (gb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Peermusic III LTD., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (gb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jon Josephson, Spankies, LLC (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-3061597), filed by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Cyanide Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., House of Bryant Publications, LLC, Peermusic III LTD., House of Cash, Inc., Sinnerlina, Bocephus Music, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where House of Bryant Publications LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where House of Cash, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bocephus Music, Inc. is a litigant