This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:11:47 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Malachy E Mannion. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01142

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malachy E Mannion

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Buzzard Rock Music

Universal Music MGB NA LLC

Gold Hill Music, Inc.

Fuel Publishing Inc.

Counting Crows, LLC

Happ-Dog Music

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Duncan Sheik Songs

Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

Counting Crows, LLC doing business as Jones Falls Music

Fuel Publishing Inc. doing business as Pener Pig Publishing

Universal Music MGB NA LLC doing business as Universal Music Careers

Defendants

Michael Barletta

Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc.

Thomas Trella

Robert Veet

Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc. doing business as Smoke Rings Cigar Bar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ken J. McDermott, II

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg

2 Lemoyne Drive, Suite 200

Lemoyne, PA 17043

Defendant Attorney

Sean W. Logsdon

85 Drasher Road

Drums, PA 18222

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet.(Logsdon, Sean) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

13 #5

Affidavit Exhibit C- Affidavit of Thomas Trella

13 #4

Affidavit Exhibit B- Affidavit of Robert Veet

13 #3

Affidavit Exhibit A- Affidavit of Michael Barletta

13 #2

Proposed Order

13 #1

Certificate of Nonconcurrence

#13

(#13) MOTION to Set Aside Default by Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Exhibit A- Affidavit of Michael Barletta, #4 Affidavit Exhibit B- Affidavit of Robert Veet, #5 Affidavit Exhibit C- Affidavit of Thomas Trella)(Logsdon, Sean) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#12

(#12) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet (ep) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#11

(#11) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Duncan Sheik Songs, Fuel Publishing Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Robert Veet served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Thomas Trella served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Michael Barletta served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/18/19. (bs) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Duncan Sheik Songs, Fuel Publishing Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc... (McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#4

(#4) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO 121) mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ao) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet.(Logsdon, Sean) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Set Aside Default by Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Exhibit A- Affidavit of Michael Barletta, #4 Affidavit Exhibit B- Affidavit of Robert Veet, #5 Affidavit Exhibit C- Affidavit of Thomas Trella)(Logsdon, Sean) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet (ep) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Duncan Sheik Songs, Fuel Publishing Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Robert Veet served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Thomas Trella served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Michael Barletta served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/18/19. (bs) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Duncan Sheik Songs, Fuel Publishing Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc... (McDermott, Ken) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO 121) mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ao) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXHIBIT by Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Duncan Sheik Songs, Fuel Publishing Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. (ao) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4806408), filed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gold Hill Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fuel Publishing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC is a litigant