This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 08:35:38 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against B Entertainment Ventures, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Stephen V. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01046

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Da Crippler Publishing

Soar Loser Music

Spirit One Music, A Division Of Spirit Music Group, Inc.

House Of Fun Music, Inc.,

Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC

EMI Blackwood Music Inc.

Collipark Music

E W C Publishing Co.

Spirit One Music

House Of Fun Music, Inc.

Defendants

Jose Sambolin

S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc. d/b/a 340nightclub a/k/a 340 Restaurant & Nightclub

S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc.

S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc. doing business as 340Nightclub aka 340 Restaurant and Nightclub

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AnnMarie Mori

Attorney at TroyGould PC

1801 Century Park East 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2367

Russell I Glazer

Attorney at TroyGould PC

1801 Century Park East 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2367

Defendant Attorneys

Clifford L White

Attorney at The Myers Law Group

4695 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Nicholas Duane Myers

Attorney at Myers Law Group

4695 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER ON STIPULATION RE: EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #15 . Defendants shall have until April 29, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (mrgo) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 29, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc., Jose Sambolin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Clifford) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Jose Sambolin, S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc..(Attorney Clifford L White added to party S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford L White added to party Jose Sambolin(pty:dft))(White, Clifford) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., upon Defendant Jose Sambolin served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mike Bada, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 served on 2/22/2020. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., upon Defendant S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc. served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mike Bada, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#10

(#10) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-01046 SVW(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#8

(#8) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc., Jose Sambolin. (esa) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV 11C) (esa) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25237368 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attorney AnnMarie Mori added to party Broadcast Music, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER ON STIPULATION RE: EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #15 . Defendants shall have until April 29, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (mrgo) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 29, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc., Jose Sambolin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Clifford) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Jose Sambolin, S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc..(Attorney Clifford L White added to party S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford L White added to party Jose Sambolin(pty:dft))(White, Clifford) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., upon Defendant Jose Sambolin served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mike Bada, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 served on 2/22/2020. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., upon Defendant S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc. served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mike Bada, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-01046 SVW(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants S.B. Entertainment Ventures, Inc., Jose Sambolin. (esa) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV 11C) (esa) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., identifying see Certificate and Attachment. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25237368 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attorney AnnMarie Mori added to party Broadcast Music, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where House of Fun Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EWC PUBLISHING, CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant