Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 14:06:09 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Salt Bar, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Salt Bar, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Indiana Angel Music

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music

Big Red Toe Music, is a division of Big Loud Shirt Industries LLC

Sea Gayle Music LLC

No Surrender Music, a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc.

EMI Blackwood Music Inc.

Songs Of Universal, Inc.

Spirit Music Group Inc.

BMG Rights Management US LLC

Eleksylum Music, Inc.

Amarillo Sky Songs

Rondor Music International, Inc.

Average Joe's Entertainment Group LLC

Eldorotto Music Publishing

Lucky Thumb Music

Noah's Little Boat Music

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Buzzard Rock Music

Defendants

Salt Bar, LLC

Sean Carey

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M. Keith Kapp

Attorney at Williams Mullen

301 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1700, Post Office Box 1000 (Zip 27602)

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Summonses Issued as to Sean Carey, Salt Bar, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#25

(#25) Copyright Report sent to U.S. Copyright Office at 101 Independence Ave. S.E. Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#24

(#24) Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as an Eastern Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 4:19-CV-80-D. No further filing shall be made in 7:19-CV-102-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/28/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#23

(#23) Financial Disclosure Statement by Amarillo Sky Songs (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#22

(#22) Financial Disclosure Statement by Big Red Toe Music, is a division of Big Loud Shirt Industries LLC (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#21

(#21) Financial Disclosure Statement by Spirit Music Group Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Spirit Services Holdings SARL for Spirit Music Group Inc.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#20

(#20) Financial Disclosure Statement by Big Gassed Hitties (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#8

(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#7

(#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by No Surrender Music, a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#6

(#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Eleksylum Music, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Elektra/Asylum/Nonesuch Records, a division of Warner Communications for Eleksylum Music, Inc.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Rondor Music International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by M. Keith Kapp on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit - Song Schedule

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4959202.), filed by Amarillo Sky Songs, Spirit Music Group Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Average Joe's Entertainment Group LLC, Lucky Thumb Music, Songs Of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Eldorotto Music Publishing, Indiana Angel Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Noah's Little Boat Music, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Rondor Music International, Inc., BMG Rights Management US LLC, Buzzard Rock Music, Eleksylum Music, Inc., Big Red Toe Music, is a division of Big Loud Shirt Industries LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, No Surrender Music, a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc., Big Gassed Hitties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Summonses Issued as to Sean Carey, Salt Bar, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Copyright Report sent to U.S. Copyright Office at 101 Independence Ave. S.E. Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Case transferred in from Southern Division on 05/28/2019. Old Case Number 7:19-cv-102. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as an Eastern Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 4:19-CV-80-D. No further filing shall be made in 7:19-CV-102-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/28/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL - This case should have been filed in the Eastern Division. A case division reassignment order will be entered by the Clerk. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Financial Disclosure Statement by Amarillo Sky Songs (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Financial Disclosure Statement by Big Red Toe Music, is a division of Big Loud Shirt Industries LLC (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Financial Disclosure Statement by Spirit Music Group Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Spirit Services Holdings SARL for Spirit Music Group Inc.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Financial Disclosure Statement by Big Gassed Hitties (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Songs Of Universal, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs Of Universal, Inc.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Financial Disclosure Statement by BMG Rights Management US LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bertelsmann, Inc. for BMG Rights Management US LLC. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by No Surrender Music, a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Eleksylum Music, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Elektra/Asylum/Nonesuch Records, a division of Warner Communications for Eleksylum Music, Inc.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Rondor Music International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by M. Keith Kapp on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4959202.), filed by Amarillo Sky Songs, Spirit Music Group Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Average Joe's Entertainment Group LLC, Lucky Thumb Music, Songs Of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Eldorotto Music Publishing, Indiana Angel Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Noah's Little Boat Music, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Rondor Music International, Inc., BMG Rights Management US LLC, Buzzard Rock Music, Eleksylum Music, Inc., Big Red Toe Music, is a division of Big Loud Shirt Industries LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, No Surrender Music, a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc., Big Gassed Hitties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Kapp, M.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eleksylum Music Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BMG Rights Management (UK) Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant