This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2022 at 08:07:23 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Salona Pizza Restaurant & Lounge, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Salona Pizza Restaurant Lounge, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00169

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

Broken Arrow Music Corporation

Universal-Millhouse Music, a Division of Magna Sound Corp.

BOCEPHUS Music Inc.

House of Cash, Inc.

Unichappell Music, Inc.

Rondor Music International, Inc.

SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV ACUFF ROSE MUSIC

R-KEY DARKUS Publishing

ORBI-LEE Publishing

ROYS BOYS LLC

SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING

GIBB BROTHERS Music

CROMPTON SONGS

EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC

WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP.;

Eleksylum Music, Inc.

No Surrender Music

Defendant

SALONA PIZZA RESTAURANT & LOUNGE, INC. d/b/a SALONA

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd A. Sullivan

Attorney at Hayes Soloway PC

175 Canal St

Manchester, NH 03101-2335

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Important Notice, Song Schedule as to Anastasia Zisis, Angelo Zisis filed by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 5/31/2022. Answer Follow Up on 6/21/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#23

(#23) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Important Notice, Song Schedule as to Salona Pizza Restaurant & Lounge. Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 5/17/2022. Answer Follow Up on 6/7/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

22 #1

Notice ECF

22 #22

Main Document

21 #4

Appendix AO121

21 #3

Appendix AO121

21 #2

Appendix AO121

21 #1

Appendix AO121

21 #21

Main Document

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement by Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

1 #6

Summons - Waiver Summons Angelo

1 #5

Summons - Waiver Summons Anastasia

1 #4

Summons - Waiver Summons Salona

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit song schedule

1 #1

Exhibit schedule 7.1

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Important Notice, Song Schedule as to Anastasia Zisis, Angelo Zisis filed by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 5/31/2022. Answer Follow Up on 6/21/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Important Notice, Song Schedule as to Salona Pizza Restaurant & Lounge. Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 5/17/2022. Answer Follow Up on 6/7/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Summons(es) issued electronically as to Salona Pizza Restaurant & Lounge. Inc., Anastasia Zisis, Angelo Zisis. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons(es) and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(cmp) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (cmp) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-169-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (cmp) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AO 121 by BOCEPHUS Music Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Broken Arrow Music Corporation, CROMPTON SONGS, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, Eleksylum Music, Inc., GIBB BROTHERS Music, House of Cash, Inc., No Surrender Music, ORBI-LEE Publishing, R-KEY DARKUS Publishing, ROYS BOYS LLC, Rondor Music International, Inc., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV ACUFF ROSE MUSIC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING, Unichappell Music, Inc., Universal-Millhouse Music, a Division of Magna Sound Corp., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP.; (Attachments: #1 Appendix AO121, #2 Appendix AO121, #3 Appendix AO121, #4 Appendix AO121)(Sullivan, Todd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2022: #5 Combined and signed AO121s) (cmp). (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Disclosure Statement by No Surrender Music disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party No Surrender Music(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Disclosure Statement by Eleksylum Music, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party Eleksylum Music, Inc.(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Disclosure Statement by WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP.; disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP.;(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Disclosure Statement by EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement by SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV ACUFF ROSE MUSIC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV ACUFF ROSE MUSIC(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement by Rondor Music International, Inc. disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party Rondor Music International, Inc.(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement by Unichappell Music, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party Unichappell Music, Inc.(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement by House of Cash, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party House of Cash, Inc.(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement by BOCEPHUS Music Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party BOCEPHUS Music Inc.(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement by Universal-Millhouse Music, a Division of Magna Sound Corp. disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party Universal-Millhouse Music, a Division of Magna Sound Corp. (pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement by Broken Arrow Music Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party Broken Arrow Music Corporation(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement by Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. Attorney Todd A. Sullivan added to party Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.(pty:pla).(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2248760 filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit schedule 7.1, #2 Exhibit song schedule, #3 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #4 Summons - Waiver Summons Salona, #5 Summons - Waiver Summons Anastasia, #6 Summons - Waiver Summons Angelo)(Sullivan, Todd) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broken Arrow Music, Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Roys Boys LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL-MILLHOUSE MUSIC, a DIVISION OF MAGNA SOUND CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where House of Cash, Inc. is a litigant